This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 10/05/2020 at 07:07:46 (UTC).

SPENCER, IRENE vs SPENCER, PHILLIP

Case Summary

On 08/07/2020 SPENCER, IRENE filed an Other lawsuit against SPENCER, PHILLIP. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MONIQUE RICHARDSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1454

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MONIQUE RICHARDSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SPENCER, IRENE

Tallahassee, FL 32312

Defendant

SPENCER, PHILLIP

Tallahassee, FL 32308

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ADRIAN S MIDDLETON

1469 Market Street2920538

Tallahassee, FL 32312

Defendant Attorney

TRUDY E INNES RICHARDSON

487 E. Tennessee Street Suite 1 3053583

Tallahassee, FL 32303

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

8/7/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM/COMPLAINT

8/7/2020: STATEMENT OF CLAIM/COMPLAINT

PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #1523028

8/10/2020: PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #1523028

SUMMONS ISSUED

8/13/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

9/10/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION TO DISMISS

9/10/2020: MOTION TO DISMISS

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #1524230

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #1523028

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketJUDGE RICHARDSON, MONIQUE R: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DispositionAction Description: COUNTY CIVIL OVER $15,000 BUT LESS THAN $30,000; Open/Reopen Status: OPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 8/7/2020; Judge: RICHARDSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ADRIAN S MIDDLETON, ESQ