This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 10/05/2020 at 15:05:41 (UTC).

SMITH, BRENDA vs CASTLE KEY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/26/2020 SMITH, BRENDA filed an Other lawsuit against CASTLE KEY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JASON JONES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1550

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JASON JONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SMITH, BRENDA

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Defendant

CASTLE KEY INSURANCE COMPANY

200 East Gaines Street2755293

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEO MANZANILLA

770 Ponce De Leon Blvd Suite 101 2981921

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Defendant Attorney

DAVID W MOLHEM

320 W Kennedy Blvd Suite 3301221685

Tampa, FL 33606

 

Court Documents

ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

9/28/2020: ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF FILING INSUREANCE POLICY

9/18/2020: NOTICE OF FILING INSUREANCE POLICY

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND EMAIL ADDRESS

9/18/2020: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND EMAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

9/18/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #1525441

8/26/2020: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #1525441

STATEMENT OF CLAIM/COMPLAINT

8/26/2020: STATEMENT OF CLAIM/COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

8/26/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

8/26/2020: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

8/26/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

8/26/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

8/26/2020: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

8/26/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INSUREANCE POLICY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DispositionAction Description: COUNTY CIVIL OVER $15,000 BUT LESS THAN $30,000; Open/Reopen Status: OPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 8/26/2020 2:28:57 PM; Judge: JONES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #1525441

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketJUDGE JONES, JASON LEE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Castle Key Ins Co is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Molhem, David W