*************1539
07/01/2021
Disposed - Other Disposed
Other
Not Classified By Court
Leon, Florida
MONIQUE RICHARDSON
SIMMONS, LUCRETIA
AMERICAN TRADITIONS INSURANCE COMPANY
1/6/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS INTERROGATORIES
11/5/2021: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS DISCOVERY REQUEST
10/4/2021: DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS DISCOVERY
7/2/2021: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2021-07-02
5/23/2022: ORDER REQUIRING NOTICE OF DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT
12/15/2021: AGREED ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY
9/8/2021: DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT
6/30/2021: STATEMENT OF CLAIM/COMPLAINT
1/18/2022: DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT
1/6/2022: DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SERVING ITS RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
1/6/2022: DEFENDANTS PRIVILEGE LOG IN SUPPORT OF ITS PRIVILEGE BASED OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
11/3/2021: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS
10/5/2021: DEFENDANTS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO PLAINTIFF
10/5/2021: DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SERVING INITIAL INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF LUCRETIA SIMMONS
10/4/2021: DEFENDANTS RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
8/23/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS
8/20/2021: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS
8/20/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
DocketDocket Code: DEACTATT; Docket Text: CASE CLOSED 30 DAYS PER RJA 2.505(F) DEACTIVATE ATTORNEY for ATT TANAZ SALEHI on 07/10/2022; Source: BM
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Code: DEACTATT; Docket Text: CASE CLOSED 30 DAYS PER RJA 2.505(F) DEACTIVATE ATTORNEY for ATT TANAZ SALEHI on 07/10/2022; Source: BM
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Code: DEACTATT; Docket Text: CASE CLOSED 30 DAYS PER RJA 2.505(F) DEACTIVATE ATTORNEY for ATT OSCAR LOMBANA on 07/10/2022; Source: BM
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Code: DEACTATT; Docket Text: CASE CLOSED 30 DAYS PER RJA 2.505(F) DEACTIVATE ATTORNEY for ATT YITZHAK LEVIN on 07/10/2022; Source: BM
[-] Read LessDispositionDISPOSED BY JUDGE; Action Description: COUNTY CIVIL OVER $15,000 BUT LESS THAN $30,000; Open/Reopen Status: CLOS; Open/Reopen Date: 7/1/2021; Judge: RICHARDSON
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Code: NDOD; Docket Text: ORDER REQUIRING NOTICE OF DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT; Source: BM
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Code: NOTO; Docket Text: DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT; Source: BM
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Code: NSOI; Docket Text: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS INTERROGATORIES; Source: BM
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Code: RESP; Docket Text: DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SERVING ITS RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Source: BM
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Code: PRLG; Docket Text: DEFENDANTS PRIVILEGE LOG IN SUPPORT OF ITS PRIVILEGE BASED OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Source: BM
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #1581696; Source: BM
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Code: RQPR; Docket Text: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Source: BM
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Code: RQAD; Docket Text: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Source: BM
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Code: NSOI; Docket Text: NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT; Source: BM
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Code: UOCC; Docket Text: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2021-07-02; Source: BM
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #1579164; Source: BM
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Code: a002; Docket Text: JUDGE RICHARDSON, MONIQUE R: ASSIGNED; Source: BM
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Code: COCOMP_SC; Docket Text: STATEMENT OF CLAIM/COMPLAINT; Source: BM
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Code: CCS; Docket Text: CIVIL COVER SHEET; Source: BM
[-] Read Less