This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 03/02/2023 at 10:28:31 (UTC).

SIMMONS, LUCRETIA vs AMERICAN TRADITIONS INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/01/2021 SIMMONS, LUCRETIA filed an Other lawsuit against AMERICAN TRADITIONS INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MONIQUE RICHARDSON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1539

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MONIQUE RICHARDSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SIMMONS, LUCRETIA

Defendant

AMERICAN TRADITIONS INSURANCE COMPANY

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS INTERROGATORIES

1/6/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS INTERROGATORIES

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS DISCOVERY REQUEST

11/5/2021: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS DISCOVERY REQUEST

DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS DISCOVERY

10/4/2021: DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS DISCOVERY

UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2021-07-02

7/2/2021: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2021-07-02

ORDER REQUIRING NOTICE OF DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT

5/23/2022: ORDER REQUIRING NOTICE OF DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT

AGREED ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY

12/15/2021: AGREED ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY

DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

9/8/2021: DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

STATEMENT OF CLAIM/COMPLAINT

6/30/2021: STATEMENT OF CLAIM/COMPLAINT

DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

1/18/2022: DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SERVING ITS RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

1/6/2022: DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SERVING ITS RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

DEFENDANTS PRIVILEGE LOG IN SUPPORT OF ITS PRIVILEGE BASED OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

1/6/2022: DEFENDANTS PRIVILEGE LOG IN SUPPORT OF ITS PRIVILEGE BASED OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

11/3/2021: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

DEFENDANTS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO PLAINTIFF

10/5/2021: DEFENDANTS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO PLAINTIFF

DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SERVING INITIAL INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF LUCRETIA SIMMONS

10/5/2021: DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SERVING INITIAL INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF LUCRETIA SIMMONS

DEFENDANTS RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

10/4/2021: DEFENDANTS RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

8/23/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

8/20/2021: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

8/20/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

07/10/2022

DocketDocket Code: DEACTATT; Docket Text: CASE CLOSED 30 DAYS PER RJA 2.505(F) DEACTIVATE ATTORNEY for ATT TANAZ SALEHI on 07/10/2022; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/10/2022

DocketDocket Code: DEACTATT; Docket Text: CASE CLOSED 30 DAYS PER RJA 2.505(F) DEACTIVATE ATTORNEY for ATT TANAZ SALEHI on 07/10/2022; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/10/2022

DocketDocket Code: DEACTATT; Docket Text: CASE CLOSED 30 DAYS PER RJA 2.505(F) DEACTIVATE ATTORNEY for ATT OSCAR LOMBANA on 07/10/2022; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/10/2022

DocketDocket Code: DEACTATT; Docket Text: CASE CLOSED 30 DAYS PER RJA 2.505(F) DEACTIVATE ATTORNEY for ATT YITZHAK LEVIN on 07/10/2022; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/08/2022

DispositionDISPOSED BY JUDGE; Action Description: COUNTY CIVIL OVER $15,000 BUT LESS THAN $30,000; Open/Reopen Status: CLOS; Open/Reopen Date: 7/1/2021; Judge: RICHARDSON

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/23/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: NDOD; Docket Text: ORDER REQUIRING NOTICE OF DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/18/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: NOTO; Docket Text: DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/06/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: NSOI; Docket Text: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS INTERROGATORIES; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/06/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: RESP; Docket Text: DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SERVING ITS RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/06/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: PRLG; Docket Text: DEFENDANTS PRIVILEGE LOG IN SUPPORT OF ITS PRIVILEGE BASED OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
07/16/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #1581696; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/16/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: RQPR; Docket Text: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/16/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: RQAD; Docket Text: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/16/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: NSOI; Docket Text: NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/16/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: UOCC; Docket Text: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2021-07-02; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #1579164; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2021

DocketDocket Code: a002; Docket Text: JUDGE RICHARDSON, MONIQUE R: ASSIGNED; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: COCOMP_SC; Docket Text: STATEMENT OF CLAIM/COMPLAINT; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: CCS; Docket Text: CIVIL COVER SHEET; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less