This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 05/16/2023 at 01:21:55 (UTC).

SIMMONS, LUCRETIA vs AMERICAN TRADITIONS INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/01/2021 SIMMONS, LUCRETIA filed an Other lawsuit against AMERICAN TRADITIONS INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is AUGUSTUS AIKENS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1536

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

AUGUSTUS AIKENS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SIMMONS, LUCRETIA

Defendant

AMERICAN TRADITIONS INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

TANAZ SALEHI

YITZHAK LEVIN

OSCAR LOMBANA

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

5/5/2023: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

ORDER ON JOINT MOTION TO APPEAR REMOTELY VIA ZOOM FOR JANUARY 19, 2022, HEARING

1/13/2022: ORDER ON JOINT MOTION TO APPEAR REMOTELY VIA ZOOM FOR JANUARY 19, 2022, HEARING

DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFFS PURSUANT TO FLORIDA STATUTE 57.105

1/11/2022: DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFFS PURSUANT TO FLORIDA STATUTE 57.105

JOINT MOTION TO APPEAR REMOTELY VIA ZOOM FOR JANUARY 19, 2022, HEARING

1/10/2022: JOINT MOTION TO APPEAR REMOTELY VIA ZOOM FOR JANUARY 19, 2022, HEARING

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS DISCOVERY REQUEST

11/5/2021: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS DISCOVERY REQUEST

DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFFS

10/13/2021: DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFFS

DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT BASED ON PREMATURE FILING OF LAWSUIT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO ABATE/STAY AND MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF LAW

10/12/2021: DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT BASED ON PREMATURE FILING OF LAWSUIT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO ABATE/STAY AND MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF LAW

DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS DISCOVERY

10/4/2021: DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS DISCOVERY

DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

9/8/2021: DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF FAILURE TO PROSECUTE

4/27/2023: NOTICE OF FAILURE TO PROSECUTE

COURT MINUTES

1/19/2022: COURT MINUTES

DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

1/18/2022: DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS DISCOVERY REQUESTS

12/10/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS DISCOVERY REQUESTS

NOTICE OF HEARING

11/22/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

11/3/2021: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

DEFENDANTS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF

10/5/2021: DEFENDANTS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

10/5/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

DEFENDANTS RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

10/4/2021: DEFENDANTS RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

05/05/2023

DispositionDISMISSED AFTER HEARING; Action Description: COUNTY CIVIL OVER $15,000 BUT LESS THAN $30,000; Open/Reopen Status: CLOS; Open/Reopen Date: 7/1/2021; Judge: AIKENS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: NVD; Docket Text: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: NFTP; Docket Text: NOTICE OF FAILURE TO PROSECUTE; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/19/2022

HearingEvent: MOTION HEARING; Start: 10:10 AM; Location: CA1; Judge: AIKENS; Result: HEARING HELD; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/19/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: CTCM; Docket Text: COURT MINUTES; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/18/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: NOTO; Docket Text: DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: ORDR; Docket Text: ORDER ON JOINT MOTION TO APPEAR REMOTELY VIA ZOOM FOR JANUARY 19, 2022, HEARING; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/11/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: MOFO; Docket Text: DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFFS PURSUANT TO FLORIDA STATUTE 57.105; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/10/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: MFTH; Docket Text: JOINT MOTION TO APPEAR REMOTELY VIA ZOOM FOR JANUARY 19, 2022, HEARING; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/10/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: NOTO; Docket Text: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS DISCOVERY REQUESTS; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
07/20/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: RQPR; Docket Text: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: RQAD; Docket Text: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: NSOI; Docket Text: NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: AMCO; Docket Text: AMENDED STATEMENT OF CLAIM; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: UOCC; Docket Text: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2021-07-01; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #1579090; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2021

DocketDocket Code: a002; Docket Text: JUDGE AIKENS, AUGUSTUS D JR: ASSIGNED; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: COCOMP_SC; Docket Text: STATEMENT OF CLAIM/COMPLAINT; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: CCS; Docket Text: CIVIL COVER SHEET; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less