This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 01/12/2023 at 03:56:49 (UTC).

SEALS, THELMA vs TALLAHASSEE RETAIL VENTURE LLC

Case Summary

On 06/29/2022 SEALS, THELMA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against TALLAHASSEE RETAIL VENTURE LLC. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN COOPER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1132

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JOHN COOPER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SEALS, THELMA

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Defendant

TALLAHASSEE RETAIL VENTURE LLC

1200 South Pine Island Road, 3233783

Plantation, FL 33324

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHN FOOTE

313 North Monroe St, Ste 401 3203867

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Defendant Attorney

SEAN J REEVES

200 West Forsyth Street, Suite 1400 2997284

Jacksonville, FL 32202

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

6/29/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

6/29/2022: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

6/29/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #1648630

6/30/2022: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #1648630

UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2022-06-30

6/30/2022: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2022-06-30

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

8/30/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL AND REQUEST FOR SERVICE

8/30/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL AND REQUEST FOR SERVICE

DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SERVING ITS FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

8/30/2022: DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SERVING ITS FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

DEFENDANTS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF

8/30/2022: DEFENDANTS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF

MOTION TO COMPEL

10/14/2022: MOTION TO COMPEL

NOTICE OF HEARING

10/21/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING

AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

12/9/2022: AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

LETTER / EMAIL

12/27/2022: LETTER / EMAIL

AGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL

12/27/2022: AGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL

ORDER SETTING JURY TRIAL

1/4/2023: ORDER SETTING JURY TRIAL

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2023
  • HearingEvent: JURY TRIAL; Start: 9:00 AM; Location: 365B; Judge: COOPER; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2023
  • HearingEvent: JURY SELECTION; Start: 9:00 AM; Location: 365B; Judge: COOPER; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • HearingEvent: PRETRIALS; Start: 9:30 AM; Location: ZOOMC; Judge: COOPER; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketDocket Code: a120; Docket Text: PRETRIALS SET FOR 05/18/2023 AT 9:30 AM IN ZOOMC, JDG: COOPER, JOHN C; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketDocket Code: a120; Docket Text: JURY SELECTION SET FOR 06/09/2023 AT 9:00 AM IN 365B, JDG: COOPER, JOHN C; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketDocket Code: a120; Docket Text: JURY TRIAL SET FOR 06/12/2023 AT 9:00 AM IN 365B, JDG: COOPER, JOHN C; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: OSJT; Docket Text: ORDER SETTING JURY TRIAL; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: ORCM; Docket Text: AGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: LETR; Docket Text: LETTER / EMAIL; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • HearingEvent: MOTION HEARING; Start: 4:15 PM; Location: ZOOMC; Judge: COOPER; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NSOI; Docket Text: DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SERVING ITS FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NAPR; Docket Text: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL AND REQUEST FOR SERVICE; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: AAAD; Docket Text: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: UOCC; Docket Text: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2022-06-30; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #1648630; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketDocket Code: a002; Docket Text: JUDGE COOPER, JOHN C: ASSIGNED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DispositionAction Description: NEGLIGENCE PREMISES LIABILITY COMMERCIAL; Open/Reopen Status: OPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 6/29/2022; Judge: COOPER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: COMP_CA; Docket Text: COMPLAINT; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: CCS; Docket Text: CIVIL COVER SHEET; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TALLAHASSEE RETAIL VENTURE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JOHN FOOTE