Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 05/26/2020 at 15:10:05 (UTC).

SCOTT, CARLOS ANDRES vs TEDDER, JOHN ALAN

Case Summary

On 03/13/2020 SCOTT, CARLOS ANDRES filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against TEDDER, JOHN ALAN. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN COOPER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0498

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Leon County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JOHN COOPER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SCOTT, CARLOS ANDRES

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Defendants

TEDDER, JOHN ALAN

Pierson, FL 32180

CITY OF TALLAHASSEE

300 South Adams Street B-27 2773175

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CRAIG A RICHARDS

313 North Monroe Street, Suite 401 3031183

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Defendant Attorney

JAMES FLOYD

Citys Attorney Office 300 S Adams Street,Box A5 2489453

Tallahassee, FL 32301

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT, CITY OF TALLAHASSEES, VERIFIED ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

5/4/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT, CITY OF TALLAHASSEES, VERIFIED ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED CITY OF TALLAHASSEE

4/29/2020: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED CITY OF TALLAHASSEE

RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED CITY OF TALLAHASSEE

4/29/2020: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED CITY OF TALLAHASSEE

DEFENDANT, CITY OF TALLAHASSEES, RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

4/24/2020: DEFENDANT, CITY OF TALLAHASSEES, RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT, CITY OF TALLAHASSEES, UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

4/24/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT, CITY OF TALLAHASSEES, UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

4/15/2020: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

NOTICE OF HEARING

4/9/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION TO DISMISS AND STAY DISCOVERY AS IT RELATES TO CO-DEFENDANT JOHN ALAN TEDDER

4/8/2020: MOTION TO DISMISS AND STAY DISCOVERY AS IT RELATES TO CO-DEFENDANT JOHN ALAN TEDDER

DEFENDANT, CITY OF TALLAHASSEES, NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

4/3/2020: DEFENDANT, CITY OF TALLAHASSEES, NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

DEFENDANT CITY OF TALLAHASSEES NOTICE OF SERVING ITS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO PLAINTIFF

4/3/2020: DEFENDANT CITY OF TALLAHASSEES NOTICE OF SERVING ITS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO PLAINTIFF

DEFENDANT CITY OF TALLAHASSEES RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

4/3/2020: DEFENDANT CITY OF TALLAHASSEES RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #1502538

3/16/2020: PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #1502538

SUMMONS ISSUED

3/13/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

3/13/2020: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

3/13/2020: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

3/13/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

3/13/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

COMPLAINT

3/13/2020: COMPLAINT

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2020
  • HearingEvent: MOTION HEARING; Start: 2:00 PM; Location: 365B; Judge: COOPER; Source: BM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT, CITY OF TALLAHASSEES, VERIFIED ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED CITY OF TALLAHASSEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED CITY OF TALLAHASSEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT, CITY OF TALLAHASSEES, RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT, CITY OF TALLAHASSEES, UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketMOTION HEARING SET FOR 05/22/2020 AT 2:00 PM IN 365B, JDG: COOPER, JOHN C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS AND STAY DISCOVERY AS IT RELATES TO CO-DEFENDANT JOHN ALAN TEDDER

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF TALLAHASSEE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JAMES FLOYD