This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 01/08/2023 at 12:31:04 (UTC).

SCOTT, BRENDALEE vs BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES RETAIL INC.

Case Summary

On 06/30/2022 SCOTT, BRENDALEE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES RETAIL INC. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN COOPER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1140

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JOHN COOPER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SCOTT, BRENDALEE

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Defendant

BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES RETAIL, INC.

C/O Corporation Service Company, Ra, 1201 Hays Street 3233924

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREGORY BLACKWELL

76 South Laura Street, Suite 1100 3198341

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Defendant Attorney

KEVIN DAVIS

6100 Greenland Road, Suite 104, 3227217

Jacksonville, FL 32258

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

6/30/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

6/30/2022: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

6/30/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE TO PRODUCE

6/30/2022: NOTICE TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

6/30/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

6/30/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #1648759

7/1/2022: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #1648759

UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2022-07-01

7/1/2022: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2022-07-01

RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES RETAIL, INC.

8/5/2022: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES RETAIL, INC.

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516(B)(1) AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

9/7/2022: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516(B)(1) AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED

9/7/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED

DEFENDANT/THIRD-PARTY PLAINTIFFS ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT AGAINST MACYS, INC.

11/14/2022: DEFENDANT/THIRD-PARTY PLAINTIFFS ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT AGAINST MACYS, INC.

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

11/16/2022: NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

11/16/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RQPR; Docket Text: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NSOI; Docket Text: NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: ATTC; Docket Text: DEFENDANT/THIRD-PARTY PLAINTIFFS ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT AGAINST MACYS, INC.; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NAPR; Docket Text: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: DOEA; Docket Text: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516(B)(1) AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: ROSE; Docket Text: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES RETAIL, INC.; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: UOCC; Docket Text: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2022-07-01; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #1648759; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketDocket Code: a002; Docket Text: JUDGE COOPER, JOHN C: ASSIGNED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DispositionAction Description: NEGLIGENCE PREMISES LIABILITY COMMERCIAL; Open/Reopen Status: OPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 6/30/2022; Judge: COOPER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NSOI; Docket Text: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RQAD; Docket Text: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NTPR; Docket Text: NOTICE TO PRODUCE; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: COMP_CA; Docket Text: COMPLAINT; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: CCS; Docket Text: CIVIL COVER SHEET; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES RETAIL INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BLACKWELL, GREGORY