This case was last updated from Second Circuit Courts - Leon County on 07/17/2021 at 15:05:10 (UTC).

SARVARI, KRYSTYNA vs SUMRALL, SANDRA

Case Summary

On 07/14/2021 SARVARI, KRYSTYNA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SUMRALL, SANDRA. This case was filed in Second Circuit Courts - Leon County, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is J SMITH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1247

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

J SMITH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SARVARI, KRYSTYNA

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Defendants

SUMRALL, SANDRA

Tallahassee, FL 32309

SUMRALL, SIDNEY

Tallahassee, FL 32309

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TYLER B EVERETT

313 North Monroe Street Suite 401 2707857

Tallahassee, FL 32301

 

Court Documents

UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2021-07-16

7/16/2021: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2021-07-16

PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #1581685

7/16/2021: PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #1581685

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

7/14/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

7/14/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

7/14/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

7/14/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

7/14/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

7/14/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

SUMMONS ISSUED

7/14/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

7/14/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT

7/14/2021: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

7/14/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2021-07-16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #1581685

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketJUDGE SMITH, J LAYNE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DispositionAction Description: AUTO NEGLIGENCE; Open/Reopen Status: OPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 7/14/2021 11:21:09 AM; Judge: SMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TYLER B EVERETT