This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 05/26/2020 at 14:08:49 (UTC).

SABAL COURT PARTNERS LLC vs TRIPPLET, MARCIAS

Case Summary

On 03/13/2020 SABAL COURT PARTNERS LLC filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against TRIPPLET, MARCIAS. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NINA ASHENAFI RICHARDSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0919

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NINA ASHENAFI RICHARDSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SABAL COURT PARTNERS LLC

2125 Jackson Bluff Rd 3091348

Tallahassee, FL 32304

Defendant

TRIPPLET, MARCIAS

Tallahassee, FL 32304

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

3/13/2020: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

3/13/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED

3/16/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED

PAYMENT $194.00 RECEIPT #1502626

3/16/2020: PAYMENT $194.00 RECEIPT #1502626

CIVIL FEE LATE LETTER

3/16/2020: CIVIL FEE LATE LETTER

RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED

4/1/2020: RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED

RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED

4/1/2020: RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL FEE LATE LETTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $194.00 RECEIPT #1502626

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketCOPIES MAILED TO TENANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketJUDGE ASHENAFI RICHARDSON, NINA: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DispositionAction Description: LANDLORD-TENANT NON-MONETARY; Open/Reopen Status: OPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 3/13/2020; Judge: ASHENAFI RICHARDSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less