This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 03/14/2023 at 01:27:56 (UTC).

ROQUEPLOT, DIANE vs CITY OF TALLAHASSEE

Case Summary

On 11/04/2022 ROQUEPLOT, DIANE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF TALLAHASSEE. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ANGELA DEMPSEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1969

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ANGELA DEMPSEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROQUEPLOT, DIANE

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Defendant

CITY OF TALLAHASSEE

300 South Adams Street, 3258613

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHN FOOTE

313 North Monroe St, Ste 401 3203867

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Defendant Attorney

KATHRYN L HOOD

300 S Adams St Box A-5, 3181503

Tallahassee, FL 32301

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/4/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

11/4/2022: COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

11/4/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES

11/4/2022: NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND EMAIL ADDRESS

11/4/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND EMAIL ADDRESS

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/4/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #1673138

11/7/2022: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #1673138

UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2022-11-07

11/7/2022: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2022-11-07

AMENDED NOTICE OF SERVING PLAINTIFFS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

11/21/2022: AMENDED NOTICE OF SERVING PLAINTIFFS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

12/21/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

DEFENDANTS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF

12/23/2022: DEFENDANTS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF

DEFENDANT, CITY OF TALLAHASSEES, NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

12/23/2022: DEFENDANT, CITY OF TALLAHASSEES, NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

CITY OF TALLAHASSEES RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

1/5/2023: CITY OF TALLAHASSEES RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - AGENCY CITY OF TALLAHASSEE

1/10/2023: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - AGENCY CITY OF TALLAHASSEE

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES

1/12/2023: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT, CITY OF TALLAHASSEES, VERIFIED ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS AMENDED FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

1/23/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT, CITY OF TALLAHASSEES, VERIFIED ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS AMENDED FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

3/9/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NOTO; Docket Text: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NSOI; Docket Text: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT, CITY OF TALLAHASSEES, VERIFIED ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS AMENDED FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NOPR; Docket Text: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: ROSE; Docket Text: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - AGENCY CITY OF TALLAHASSEE; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RDD; Docket Text: CITY OF TALLAHASSEES RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NSOI; Docket Text: DEFENDANT, CITY OF TALLAHASSEES, NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RQPR; Docket Text: DEFENDANTS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: AAAD; Docket Text: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NSOI; Docket Text: AMENDED NOTICE OF SERVING PLAINTIFFS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: UOCC; Docket Text: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2022-11-07; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #1673138; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketDocket Code: a002; Docket Text: JUDGE DEMPSEY, ANGELA C: ASSIGNED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DispositionAction Description: NEGLIGENCE PREMISES LIABILITY COMMERCIAL; Open/Reopen Status: OPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 11/4/2022; Judge: DEMPSEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: DOEA; Docket Text: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND EMAIL ADDRESS; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NOPI; Docket Text: NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RQPR; Docket Text: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: COMP_CA; Docket Text: COMPLAINT; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: CCS; Docket Text: CIVIL COVER SHEET; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less