This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 03/02/2023 at 08:26:55 (UTC).

ROBINSON, DUSHUN DEVON vs MARK INCH SECRETARY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS

Case Summary

On 07/01/2021 ROBINSON, DUSHUN DEVON filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against MARK INCH SECRETARY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is STEFANIE NEWLIN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1366

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

STEFANIE NEWLIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBINSON, DUSHUN DEVON

Defendants

MARK INCH SECRETARY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS

J GODWIN WARDEN COLUMBIA CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION

 

Court Documents

ORDER GRANTING

3/31/2022: ORDER GRANTING

ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO CANCEL

3/31/2022: ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO CANCEL

JOINT STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

3/30/2022: JOINT STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

DEFENDANTS MOTION TO CANCEL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

3/30/2022: DEFENDANTS MOTION TO CANCEL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED

3/29/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

3/29/2022: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

ORDER TO PROVIDE TELEPHONE NUMBER FOR APRIL 5, 2022 PRE-TRIAL MEDIATION CONFERENCE

3/23/2022: ORDER TO PROVIDE TELEPHONE NUMBER FOR APRIL 5, 2022 PRE-TRIAL MEDIATION CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF HEARING

2/25/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING

ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO CANCEL

2/22/2022: ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO CANCEL

DEFENDANTS MOTION TO CANCEL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE OR ALTERNATIVELY CONTINUE

2/22/2022: DEFENDANTS MOTION TO CANCEL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE OR ALTERNATIVELY CONTINUE

ORDER TO PROVIDE TELEPHONE NUMBER FOR MARCH 1, 2022 PRE-TRIAL MEDIATION CONFERENCE

2/16/2022: ORDER TO PROVIDE TELEPHONE NUMBER FOR MARCH 1, 2022 PRE-TRIAL MEDIATION CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

2/15/2022: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF HEARING

12/14/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO CONTINUE PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

12/13/2021: ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO CONTINUE PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

DEFENDANTS MOTION TO CONTINUE PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

12/10/2021: DEFENDANTS MOTION TO CONTINUE PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

ORDER TO PROVIDE TELEPHONE NUMBER FOR DECEMBER 21, 2021 PRE-TRIAL MEDIATION CONFERENCE

12/10/2021: ORDER TO PROVIDE TELEPHONE NUMBER FOR DECEMBER 21, 2021 PRE-TRIAL MEDIATION CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF HEARING

10/19/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION TO CONTINUE PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

10/12/2021: MOTION TO CONTINUE PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2022
  • DocketDocket Code: DEACTATT; Docket Text: CASE CLOSED 30 DAYS PER RJA 2.505(F) DEACTIVATE ATTORNEY for ATT KELLY FORREN on 05/01/2022; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2022
  • DocketDocket Code: DEACTATT; Docket Text: CASE CLOSED 30 DAYS PER RJA 2.505(F) DEACTIVATE ATTORNEY for ATT KELLY FORREN on 05/01/2022; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • HearingEvent: PRETRIAL SC; Start: 9:30 AM; Location: CA1; Judge: NEWLIN; Result: CANCELLED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • DispositionDISPOSED BY JUDGE; Action Description: REPLEVIN - MORE THAN $1000, BUT NOT MORE THAN $2500; Open/Reopen Status: CLOS; Open/Reopen Date: 7/1/2021; Judge: NEWLIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: ORGR; Docket Text: ORDER GRANTING; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: ORGR; Docket Text: ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO CANCEL; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: STIP; Docket Text: JOINT STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: MOTO; Docket Text: DEFENDANTS MOTION TO CANCEL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NAPR; Docket Text: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NOTO; Docket Text: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: ORGR; Docket Text: ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: REQU; Docket Text: REQUEST TO RESCHEDULE; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: MOCO; Docket Text: MOTION TO CONTINUE PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: CFLL; Docket Text: CIVIL FEE LATE LETTER; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketDocket Code: a002; Docket Text: JUDGE NEWLIN, STEFANIE M: ASSIGNED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketDocket Code: a120; Docket Text: PRETRIAL SC SET FOR 08/03/2021 AT 9:30 AM IN CA1, JDG: NEWLIN, STEFANIE M; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: CCS; Docket Text: CIVIL COVER SHEET; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: COMP_SC; Docket Text: STATEMENT OF CLAIM/ REPLEVIN; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less