This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 06/08/2023 at 01:07:42 (UTC).

RILEY, LATONYA vs HAZEM M INC

Case Summary

On 02/01/2023 RILEY, LATONYA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against HAZEM M INC. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN COOPER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0190

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JOHN COOPER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RILEY, LATONYA

Defendant

HAZEM M INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHN FOOTE

Defendant Attorney

TABITHA G JACKSON

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/31/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED

1/31/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND EMAIL ADDRESS

1/31/2023: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND EMAIL ADDRESS

COMPLAINT

1/31/2023: COMPLAINT

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #1688875

2/1/2023: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #1688875

UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2023-02-01

2/1/2023: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2023-02-01

RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED-HAZEM M INC

4/12/2023: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED-HAZEM M INC

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

4/28/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

DEFENDANTS ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

4/28/2023: DEFENDANTS ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: AAAD; Docket Text: DEFENDANTS ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NAPR; Docket Text: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: ROSE; Docket Text: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED-HAZEM M INC; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DispositionAction Description: NEGLIGENCE PREMISES LIABILITY COMMERCIAL; Open/Reopen Status: OPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 2/1/2023 7:28:48 AM; Judge: COOPER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: UOCC; Docket Text: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2023-02-01; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #1688875; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketDocket Code: a002; Docket Text: JUDGE COOPER, JOHN C: ASSIGNED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: COMP_CA; Docket Text: COMPLAINT; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: DOEA; Docket Text: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND EMAIL ADDRESS; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: CCS; Docket Text: CIVIL COVER SHEET; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less