*************0190
02/01/2023
Pending - Other Pending
Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Not Classified By Court
Leon, Florida
JOHN COOPER
RILEY, LATONYA
HAZEM M INC
JOHN FOOTE
TABITHA G JACKSON
1/31/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET
1/31/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED
1/31/2023: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND EMAIL ADDRESS
1/31/2023: COMPLAINT
2/1/2023: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #1688875
2/1/2023: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2023-02-01
4/12/2023: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED-HAZEM M INC
4/28/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516
4/28/2023: DEFENDANTS ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
DocketDocket Code: AAAD; Docket Text: DEFENDANTS ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Source: BM
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Code: NAPR; Docket Text: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516; Source: BM
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Code: ROSE; Docket Text: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED-HAZEM M INC; Source: BM
[-] Read LessDispositionAction Description: NEGLIGENCE PREMISES LIABILITY COMMERCIAL; Open/Reopen Status: OPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 2/1/2023 7:28:48 AM; Judge: COOPER
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Code: UOCC; Docket Text: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2023-02-01; Source: BM
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #1688875; Source: BM
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Code: a002; Docket Text: JUDGE COOPER, JOHN C: ASSIGNED; Source: BM
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Code: COMP_CA; Docket Text: COMPLAINT; Source: BM
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Code: DOEA; Docket Text: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND EMAIL ADDRESS; Source: BM
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Code: CCS; Docket Text: CIVIL COVER SHEET; Source: BM
[-] Read Less