This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 05/21/2023 at 01:06:22 (UTC).

RICHARDSON, STEVEN vs TLH ENTERTAINMENT GROUP LLC

Case Summary

On 02/01/2023 RICHARDSON, STEVEN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against TLH ENTERTAINMENT GROUP LLC. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is J MARSH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0197

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

J MARSH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RICHARDSON, STEVEN

Defendant

TLH ENTERTAINMENT GROUP, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHN FOOTE

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/31/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

1/31/2023: COMPLAINT

PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #1688895

2/1/2023: PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #1688895

UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2023-02-01

2/1/2023: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2023-02-01

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2023
  • DispositionAction Description: NEGLIGENCE PREMISES LIABILITY COMMERCIAL; Open/Reopen Status: OPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 2/1/2023 7:36:30 AM; Judge: MARSH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: UOCC; Docket Text: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2023-02-01; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #1688895; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketDocket Code: a002; Docket Text: JUDGE MARSH, J LEE: ASSIGNED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: COMP_CA; Docket Text: COMPLAINT; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: CCS; Docket Text: CIVIL COVER SHEET; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less