Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 04/29/2020 at 06:51:09 (UTC).

REYNOLDS, DELANEY vs STATE OF FLORIDA

Case Summary

On 04/16/2018 REYNOLDS, DELANEY filed an Other lawsuit against STATE OF FLORIDA. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are KEVIN CARROLL, JOHN COOPER and CHARLES DODSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0819

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Leon County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

KEVIN CARROLL

JOHN COOPER

CHARLES DODSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LUSHIA P BY GUARDIAN AND MOTHER VALERIE JEAN PHILL

Tampa, FL 33602

PSYCHAS, OSCAR

Tampa, FL 33602

VALHOLLY F BY GUARDIAN AND MOTHER RHONDA ROFF

Tampa, FL 33602

REYNOLDS, DELANEY

Tampa, FL 33602

JOSE P BY GUARDIAN AND MOTHER VALERIE JEAN PHILLIP

Tampa, FL 33602

ISAAC A BY GUARDIAN AND MOTHER JANET RAY AUGSPURG

Tampa, FL 33602

LEVI D BY GUARDIAN AND MOTHER LEIGH-ANN DRAHEIM

Tampa, FL 33602

OLIVER C BY GUARDIAN AND MOTHER EMILY CHAMBLIN

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendants

NOAH VALENSTEIN AS SECRETARY OF DEPT OF ENVIRONMEN

Tallahassee, FL 32399

GOVERNOR

The Capitol 400 South Monroe St 559724

Tallahassee, FL 32399-0001

STATE OF FLORIDA

400 S Monroe Street2561340

Tallahassee, FL 32399

ADAM PUTNUM AS COMMISSIONER OF DEPT OF AGRICULTURE

Tallahassee, FL 32399

DEPT OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION

Tallahassee, FL 32399

COMMISSIONER OF THE FLORIDA DEPT OF AGRICULTURE AN

The Capitol, Pl 10440338

Tallahassee, FL 32399

PUBLIC SERVICE COMMISSION

3900 Commonwealth Blvd 2962342

Tallahassee, FL 32399

FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF INTERNAL IMPROVEMENT

3900 Commonwealth Blvd 2962342

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Not Yet Classified

IZAAK WALTON LEAGUE OF AMERICA, INC. FLORIDA KEYS

707 Conservation Lane 3020063

Gaithersburg, MD 20878

REEF RELIEF, INC.

631 Greene Street 3020061

Key West, FL 33040

LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF FLORIDA, INC.

P.O. Box 1911 3020064

Orlando, FL 32802

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GUY M BURNS

401 East Jackson Street Suite 3100 2962343

Tampa, FL 33602

ERIN L DEADY

54 1/2 Se 6Th Avenue 2962354

Delray Beach, FL 33483

TALBOT DALEMBERTE

1117 Myers Park Dr 2962347

Tallahassee, FL 32301

MATTHEW D SCHULTZ

316 S Baylen St Suite 60041733

Pensacola, FL 32502

JANE WEST

24 Cathedral Place Suite 504 2962356

Saint Augustine, FL 32084

MITCHELL A CHESTER

7951 Sw 6Th Street Suite 112 2962351

Plantation, FL 33324

F WALLACE POPE

911 Chestnut Street 2962344

Clearwater, FL 33756

DEBRA A SWIM

1323 Diamond Street 2962355

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Defendant Attorneys

ROBERT A WILLIAMS

3900 Commonwealth Boulevard2683441

Tallahassee, FL 32399

KELLEY FRANCESCA CORBARI

3900 Commonwealth Blvd., Ms-352929587

Tallahassee, FL 32399-3000

JEFFREY BROWN

The Florida Bar 651 E. Jefferson Street 121481

Tallahassee, FL 32399

JOHN MACIVER

The Capitol Pl-05 2955599

Tallahassee, FL 32399

NICHOLAS ALLEN PRIMROSE

The Capital Pl-05 3020425

Tallahassee, FL 32399

KAREN ANN BRODEEN

Office Of The Attorney General Pl-01, The Capitol 2340488

Tallahassee, FL 32399-1050

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2020
  • HearingEvent: MOTION HEARING; Start: 1:15 PM; Location: 330A; Judge: DEMPSEY; Source: BM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • HearingEvent: MOTION HEARING; Start: 1:30 PM; Location: 330A; Judge: DEMPSEY; Result: CANCELLED; Source: BM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • HearingEvent: MOTION HEARING; Start: 1:30 PM; Location: 330A; Judge: CARROLL; Result: CANCELLED; Source: BM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • HearingEvent: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Start: 10:30 AM; Location: 330A; Judge: CARROLL; Source: BM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • HearingEvent: MOTION HEARING; Start: 1:30 PM; Location: 365B; Judge: COOPER; Result: CANCELLED; Source: BM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DispositionAction Description: OTHER CIRCUIT CIVIL; Open/Reopen Status: OPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 4/16/2018; Judge: CARROLL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where League of Women Voters is a litigant

Latest cases where Izaak Walton League of America, 18cv1496 is a litigant

Latest cases where Governor of California is a litigant

Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant