This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 03/28/2023 at 19:52:53 (UTC).

REBUILD FLORIDA LLC A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILAITY C vs FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF ECONOMIC OPPORTUNITY

Case Summary

On 09/26/2022 REBUILD FLORIDA LLC A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILAITY C filed an Intellectual Property - Other Intellectual Property lawsuit against FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF ECONOMIC OPPORTUNITY. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN COOPER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1690

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Other Intellectual Property

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JOHN COOPER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REBUILD FLORIDA LLC A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILAITY C

Defendant

FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF ECONOMIC OPPORTUNITY

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

9/23/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

9/23/2022: COMPLAINT

PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #1664931

9/26/2022: PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #1664931

UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2022-09-26

9/26/2022: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2022-09-26

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

11/22/2022: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

LETTER / EMAIL

12/13/2022: LETTER / EMAIL

ORDER OF DISMISSAL - Recorded (OR 5801.513 / 20220077971)

12/13/2022: ORDER OF DISMISSAL - Recorded (OR 5801.513 / 20220077971)

 

Docket Entries

01/15/2023

DocketDocket Code: DEACTATT; Docket Text: CASE CLOSED 30 DAYS PER RJA 2.505(F) DEACTIVATE ATTORNEY for ATT AVA DOPPELT on 01/15/2023; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/13/2022

DispositionDISPOSED BY JUDGE; Action Description: OTHER INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY; Open/Reopen Status: CLOS; Open/Reopen Date: 9/26/2022; Judge: COOPER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/13/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: ORDS; Docket Text: ORDER OF DISMISSAL - Recorded (OR 5801.513 / 20220077971); OR Book: 5801; OR Page: 513; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/13/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: LETR; Docket Text: LETTER / EMAIL; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: NOTO; Docket Text: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2022

DocketDocket Code: EMAIL; Docket Text: EMAIL SENT TO DOPPELT, AVA K RE SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2022 CA 001690, REBUILD FLORIDA LLC A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILAITY COMPANY VS. FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF ECONOMIC OPPORTUNITY WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS: UOCC-9/26/2022; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: UOCC; Docket Text: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2022-09-26; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #1664931; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2022

DocketDocket Code: a002; Docket Text: JUDGE COOPER, JOHN C: ASSIGNED; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/23/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: COMP_CA; Docket Text: COMPLAINT; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/23/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: CCS; Docket Text: CIVIL COVER SHEET; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less