Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 10/05/2020 at 06:00:16 (UTC).

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY vs BUSH, GIANNI A

Case Summary

On 07/21/2020 PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BUSH, GIANNI A. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is J SMITH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1335

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Leon County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

J SMITH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

5701 N. Pine Island Road Suite 320 3105771

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33321

Defendants

BUSH, GIANNI A

Crawfordville, FL 32327

BUSH, TRACINA S

Crawfordville, FL 32327

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEVEN J JACOBSON

5701 North Pine Island Rdsuite 320943198

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33321

 

Court Documents

ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND DISMISSAL OF CASE

9/1/2020: ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND DISMISSAL OF CASE

STIPULATED ORDER

8/25/2020: STIPULATED ORDER

STIPULATED ORDER

8/24/2020: STIPULATED ORDER

COURT MINUTES

8/18/2020: COURT MINUTES

STIPULATED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

8/18/2020: STIPULATED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF FILING CONTACT INFORMATION

8/12/2020: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF FILING CONTACT INFORMATION

RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - T BUSH

8/12/2020: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - T BUSH

RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - G BUSH

8/12/2020: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - G BUSH

PAYMENT $320.00 RECEIPT #1520503

7/21/2020: PAYMENT $320.00 RECEIPT #1520503

SUMMONS ISSUED

7/21/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

7/21/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM/COMPLAINT

7/21/2020: STATEMENT OF CLAIM/COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

7/21/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2020
  • DocketCASE CLOSED 30 DAYS PER RJA 2.505(F) DEACTIVATE ATTORNEY for ATT STEVEN JACOBSON on 09/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPROVING STIPULATED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND DISMISSAL OF CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATED ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DispositionDISPOSED BY JUDGE; Action Description: SMALL CLAIMS MORE THAN $5,000 BUT NOT MORE THAN $8000; Open/Reopen Status: CLOS; Open/Reopen Date: 7/21/2020; Judge: SMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATED ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • HearingEvent: PRETRIAL SC; Start: 9:30 AM; Location: CA1; Judge: SMITH; Source: BM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT MINUTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF FILING CONTACT INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - T BUSH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - G BUSH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $320.00 RECEIPT #1520503

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketJUDGE SMITH, J LAYNE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketPRETRIAL SC SET FOR 08/18/2020 AT 9:30 AM IN CA1, JDG: SMITH, J LAYNE

    Read MoreRead Less