This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 03/13/2023 at 01:04:41 (UTC).

POTTER, AMANDA LUCILLE vs WATSON, NOELLE ELIZABETH

Case Summary

On 12/21/2022 POTTER, AMANDA LUCILLE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against WATSON, NOELLE ELIZABETH. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is J MARSH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2240

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

J MARSH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

POTTER, AMANDA LUCILLE

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Defendants

WATSON, NOELLE ELIZABETH

Jacksonville Beach, FL 32250

WATSON, MICHAEL WILLIAM

Jacksonville Beach, FL 32250

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANNA R NORRIS

313 N Monroe St., Suite 401, 3133588

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Defendant Attorneys

VIRGIL W WRIGHT

1820 Se 18Th Avenue, Suite 1 2666680

Ocala, FL 34471

CHASE FIFNER

1820 Se 18Th Avenue, Suite 1 3052514

Ocala, FL 34471

 

Court Documents

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSSIONS

2/20/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSSIONS

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSSIONS

2/20/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSSIONS

DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF INTENT TO TAKE DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF

2/20/2023: DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF INTENT TO TAKE DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

2/20/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

1/20/2023: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL

1/20/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL

NOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - M W WATSON

1/12/2023: NOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - M W WATSON

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, MICHAEL WILLIAM WATSON

12/28/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, MICHAEL WILLIAM WATSON

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, NOELLE ELIZABETH WATSON

12/28/2022: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, NOELLE ELIZABETH WATSON

PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT, MICHAEL WILLIAM WATSON

12/28/2022: PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT, MICHAEL WILLIAM WATSON

PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT, NOELLE ELIZABETH WATSON

12/28/2022: PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT, NOELLE ELIZABETH WATSON

PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, MICHAEL WILLIAM WATSON

12/28/2022: PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, MICHAEL WILLIAM WATSON

PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, NOELLE ELIZABETH WATSON

12/28/2022: PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, NOELLE ELIZABETH WATSON

UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2022-12-21

12/21/2022: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2022-12-21

PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #1681640

12/21/2022: PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #1681640

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/21/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/21/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT

12/21/2022: COMPLAINT

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RDD; Docket Text: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSSIONS; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RDD; Docket Text: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSSIONS; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NOIN; Docket Text: DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF INTENT TO TAKE DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: AAAD; Docket Text: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NOAU; Docket Text: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NAPR; Docket Text: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: ROSE; Docket Text: NOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - M W WATSON; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NSOI; Docket Text: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, M W WATSON; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NSOI; Docket Text: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, NOELLE ELIZABETH WATSON; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RQPR; Docket Text: PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT, MICHAEL WILLIAM WATSON; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RQAD; Docket Text: PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, MICHAEL WILLIAM WATSON; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RQAD; Docket Text: PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, NOELLE ELIZABETH WATSON; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DispositionAction Description: AUTO NEGLIGENCE; Open/Reopen Status: OPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 12/21/2022 1:24:06 PM; Judge: MARSH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: UOCC; Docket Text: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2022-12-21; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #1681640; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: COMP_CA; Docket Text: COMPLAINT; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: CCS; Docket Text: CIVIL COVER SHEET; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketDocket Code: a002; Docket Text: JUDGE MARSH, J LEE: ASSIGNED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less