This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 06/02/2023 at 01:44:59 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC vs GRIFFIN, MATTHEW

Case Summary

On 02/01/2023 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC filed an Other lawsuit against GRIFFIN, MATTHEW. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NINA ASHENAFI RICHARDSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0389

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NINA ASHENAFI RICHARDSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Defendant

GRIFFIN, MATTHEW

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RICHARD A RUSSELL

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

2/1/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM/COMPLAINT

2/1/2023: STATEMENT OF CLAIM/COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

2/1/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #1688959

2/1/2023: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #1688959

UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2023-02-01

2/1/2023: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2023-02-01

RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED-MATTHEW GRIFFIN

2/10/2023: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED-MATTHEW GRIFFIN

ANSWER

3/6/2023: ANSWER

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY AND DIRECTION TO CLERK TO UPDATE ATTORNEY INFORMATION

5/8/2023: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY AND DIRECTION TO CLERK TO UPDATE ATTORNEY INFORMATION

ORDER REQUIRING MEDIATION

5/11/2023: ORDER REQUIRING MEDIATION

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: ORME; Docket Text: ORDER REQUIRING MEDIATION; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NCOC; Docket Text: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY AND DIRECTION TO CLERK TO UPDATE ATTORNEY INFORMATION; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: ANSW; Docket Text: ANSWER; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: ROSE; Docket Text: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED-MATTHEW GRIFFIN; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DispositionAction Description: COUNTY CIVIL OVER $8,000 BUT LESS THAN $15,000; Open/Reopen Status: OPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 2/1/2023 11:40:09 AM; Judge: ASHENAFI RICHARDSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: UOCC; Docket Text: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2023-02-01; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #1688959; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: COCOMP_SC; Docket Text: STATEMENT OF CLAIM/COMPLAINT; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: CCS; Docket Text: CIVIL COVER SHEET; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketDocket Code: a002; Docket Text: JUDGE ASHENAFI RICHARDSON, NINA: ASSIGNED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less