This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 05/07/2023 at 01:08:01 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC vs CONLEY, DAVID

Case Summary

On 02/01/2023 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CONLEY, DAVID. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is STEFANIE NEWLIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0222

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

STEFANIE NEWLIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Defendant

CONLEY, DAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JESSICA J FAGEN

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

2/1/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM/COMPLAINT

2/1/2023: STATEMENT OF CLAIM/COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

2/1/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #1689005

2/1/2023: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #1689005

RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED-DAVID CONLEY

3/7/2023: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED-DAVID CONLEY

COURT MINUTES

3/21/2023: COURT MINUTES

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2023
  • HearingEvent: PRETRIAL SC; Start: 9:30 AM; Location: CA1; Judge: NEWLIN; Result: HEARING HELD; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: CTCM; Docket Text: COURT MINUTES; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: ROSE; Docket Text: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED-DAVID CONLEY; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DispositionAction Description: SMALL CLAIMS MORE THAN $2500.00 BUT NOT MORE THAN $5000; Open/Reopen Status: OPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 2/1/2023 1:26:03 PM; Judge: NEWLIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #1689005; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: COCOMP_SC; Docket Text: STATEMENT OF CLAIM/COMPLAINT; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: CCS; Docket Text: CIVIL COVER SHEET; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketDocket Code: a002; Docket Text: JUDGE NEWLIN, STEFANIE M: ASSIGNED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketDocket Code: a120; Docket Text: PRETRIAL SC SET FOR 03/21/2023 AT 9:30 AM IN CA1, JDG: NEWLIN, STEFANIE M; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less