This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 02/01/2023 at 06:50:04 (UTC).

PLATO VILLAS APTS LLC vs TIBE, KERRY

Case Summary

On 11/28/2022 PLATO VILLAS APTS LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against TIBE, KERRY. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MONIQUE RICHARDSON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3983

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MONIQUE RICHARDSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PLATO VILLAS APTS, LLC

724 W. Madison St, 3261938

Tallahassee, FL 32304-4324

Defendant

TIBE, KERRY

Tallahassee, FL 32303-3306

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/28/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FILED

11/28/2022: COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/28/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

PAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #1676873

11/28/2022: PAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #1676873

COPIES MAILED TO TENANT - K TIBE

11/29/2022: COPIES MAILED TO TENANT - K TIBE

RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - K TIBE

12/5/2022: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - K TIBE

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF EVICTION

12/13/2022: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF EVICTION

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2023
  • DocketDocket Code: DEACTATT; Docket Text: CASE CLOSED 30 DAYS PER RJA 2.505(F) DEACTIVATE ATTORNEY for ATT ELWIN THRASHER on 01/15/2023; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DispositionDISMISSED BEFORE HEARING; Action Description: LANDLORD-TENANT RESIDENTIAL; Open/Reopen Status: CLOS; Open/Reopen Date: 11/28/2022 2:04:23 PM; Judge: RICHARDSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: VD; Docket Text: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF EVICTION; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: ROSE; Docket Text: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - K TIBE; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: CMTT; Docket Text: COPIES MAILED TO TENANT - K TIBE; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: PAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #1676873; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: LDTN_SC; Docket Text: COMPLAINT FILED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: CCS; Docket Text: CIVIL COVER SHEET; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketDocket Code: a002; Docket Text: JUDGE RICHARDSON, MONIQUE R: ASSIGNED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less