This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 03/02/2023 at 10:30:41 (UTC).

PERSOLVE RECOVERIES LLC vs TOOLE, LAURA

Case Summary

On 07/01/2021 PERSOLVE RECOVERIES LLC filed an Other lawsuit against TOOLE, LAURA. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NINA ASHENAFI RICHARDSON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1554

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NINA ASHENAFI RICHARDSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PERSOLVE RECOVERIES LLC

Defendants

TOOLE, LAURA

TOOLE, MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2021-07-07

7/7/2021: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2021-07-07

ORDER TO TRANSFER

6/29/2022: ORDER TO TRANSFER

DEFENDANTS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE

8/3/2021: DEFENDANTS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE

COMPLAINT

7/1/2021: COMPLAINT

CERTIFIED NOTICE CARD RETURNED

7/28/2022: CERTIFIED NOTICE CARD RETURNED

CERTIFIED NOTICE CARD RETURNED

7/20/2022: CERTIFIED NOTICE CARD RETURNED

CERTIFIED RETURN RECEIPT

7/14/2022: CERTIFIED RETURN RECEIPT

TRANSFER LETTER

7/14/2022: TRANSFER LETTER

CERTIFIED RETURN RECEIPT

7/6/2022: CERTIFIED RETURN RECEIPT

TRANSFER LETTER

7/6/2022: TRANSFER LETTER

COURT MINUTES

5/26/2022: COURT MINUTES

NOTICE OF HEARING

3/31/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING

RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - LAURA TOOLE

7/14/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - LAURA TOOLE

RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - MICHAEL TOOLE

7/14/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - MICHAEL TOOLE

PAYMENT $320.00 RECEIPT #1579639

7/7/2021: PAYMENT $320.00 RECEIPT #1579639

SUMMONS ISSUED

7/1/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

7/1/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

7/1/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

07/31/2022

DocketDocket Code: DEACTATT; Docket Text: CASE CLOSED 30 DAYS PER RJA 2.505(F) DEACTIVATE ATTORNEY for ATT DANIEL HARTMAN on 07/31/2022; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/31/2022

DocketDocket Code: DEACTATT; Docket Text: CASE CLOSED 30 DAYS PER RJA 2.505(F) DEACTIVATE ATTORNEY for ATT DANIEL HARTMAN on 07/31/2022; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/31/2022

DocketDocket Code: DEACTATT; Docket Text: CASE CLOSED 30 DAYS PER RJA 2.505(F) DEACTIVATE ATTORNEY for ATT EVAN KIDD on 07/31/2022; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: CNCR; Docket Text: CERTIFIED NOTICE CARD RETURNED; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: CNCR; Docket Text: CERTIFIED NOTICE CARD RETURNED; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2022

DocketDocket Code: CT; Docket Text: CASE TRANSFERRED; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: CRR; Docket Text: CERTIFIED RETURN RECEIPT; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: LETR; Docket Text: TRANSFER LETTER; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2022

DocketDocket Code: CT; Docket Text: CASE TRANSFERRED; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: CRR; Docket Text: CERTIFIED RETURN RECEIPT; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
08/03/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: MOCV; Docket Text: DEFENDANTS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: ROSE; Docket Text: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - LAURA TOOLE; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: ROSE; Docket Text: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - MICHAEL TOOLE; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: UOCC; Docket Text: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2021-07-07; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: PAYMENT $320.00 RECEIPT #1579639; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2021

DocketDocket Code: a002; Docket Text: JUDGE ASHENAFI RICHARDSON, NINA: ASSIGNED; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: COCOMP_SC; Docket Text: COMPLAINT; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: CCS; Docket Text: CIVIL COVER SHEET; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less