This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 06/04/2023 at 01:37:17 (UTC).

PERSOLVE RECOVERIES LLC vs SLOAN, ANGELETTE

Case Summary

On 07/01/2021 PERSOLVE RECOVERIES LLC filed an Other lawsuit against SLOAN, ANGELETTE. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MONIQUE RICHARDSON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1542

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MONIQUE RICHARDSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PERSOLVE RECOVERIES LLC

Defendants

SLOAN, ANGELETTE

HARPER, LATRICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EVAN D KIDD

 

Court Documents

FINAL JUDGMENT - Recorded (OR 5854.243 / 20230029600)

6/1/2023: FINAL JUDGMENT - Recorded (OR 5854.243 / 20230029600)

ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PLAINTIFFS ATTORNEY AND WITNESS TO APPEAR REMOTE

5/11/2023: ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PLAINTIFFS ATTORNEY AND WITNESS TO APPEAR REMOTE

AFFIDAVIT IN PROOF OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND COSTS

4/25/2023: AFFIDAVIT IN PROOF OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND COSTS

MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

4/25/2023: MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

MOTION FOR PLAINTIFFS ATTORNEY AND WITNESS TO APPEAR REMOTELY

4/25/2023: MOTION FOR PLAINTIFFS ATTORNEY AND WITNESS TO APPEAR REMOTELY

JUDICIAL DEFAULT

3/29/2023: JUDICIAL DEFAULT

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

3/23/2023: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT

3/23/2023: MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT

ORDER SETTING NON-JURY TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

2/7/2023: ORDER SETTING NON-JURY TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

COURT MINUTES

5/18/2023: COURT MINUTES

NOTICE OF FILING

4/25/2023: NOTICE OF FILING

PLAINTIFFS WITNESS & EXHIBIT LIST

4/25/2023: PLAINTIFFS WITNESS & EXHIBIT LIST

COURT MINUTES

4/10/2023: COURT MINUTES

RETURNED MAIL

3/9/2023: RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL

3/1/2023: RETURNED MAIL

MEDIATION REPORT

2/1/2023: MEDIATION REPORT

PAYMENT $60.00 RECEIPT #1688123

1/27/2023: PAYMENT $60.00 RECEIPT #1688123

NOTICE OF MEDIATION

12/22/2022: NOTICE OF MEDIATION

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

06/01/2023

DispositionDEFAULT & FINAL JUDGMENT; Action Description: COUNTY CIVIL OVER $8,000 BUT LESS THAN $15,000; Open/Reopen Status: CLOS; Open/Reopen Date: 7/1/2021; Judge: RICHARDSON

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: FIJU; Docket Text: FINAL JUDGMENT - Recorded (OR 5854.243 / 20230029600); OR Book: 5854; OR Page: 243; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2023

HearingEvent: NON-JURY TRIAL; Start: 1:30 PM; Location: CA1; Judge: RICHARDSON; Result: HEARING HELD; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: CTCM; Docket Text: COURT MINUTES; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: OGTH; Docket Text: ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PLAINTIFFS ATTORNEY AND WITNESS TO APPEAR REMOTE; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: AFFD; Docket Text: AFFIDAVIT IN PROOF OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND COSTS; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: NOF; Docket Text: NOTICE OF FILING; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: MFFJ; Docket Text: MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: MFTH; Docket Text: MOTION FOR PLAINTIFFS ATTORNEY AND WITNESS TO APPEAR REMOTELY; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: WITL; Docket Text: PLAINTIFFS WITNESS & EXHIBIT LIST; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
35 More Docket Entries
07/27/2021

DocketDocket Code: a120; Docket Text: HEARING SET FOR 08/23/2021 AT 10:20 AM IN CA1, JDG: RICHARDSON, MONIQUE R; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2021

DocketDocket Code: INFJ; Docket Text: INSTRUCTIONS FROM JUDGE - PER JUDGE MRR: SCHEDULE THE ABOVE-STYLED CASE FOR A TEN (10) MINUTE PRETRIAL, NOTICE ALL PARTIES; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/23/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: ANSW; Docket Text: ANSWER - A SLOAN; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: UOCC; Docket Text: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2021-07-02; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: PAYMENT $320.00 RECEIPT #1579188; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2021

DocketDocket Code: a002; Docket Text: JUDGE RICHARDSON, MONIQUE R: ASSIGNED; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: COCOMP_SC; Docket Text: STATEMENT OF CLAIM/COMPLAINT; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: CCS; Docket Text: CIVIL COVER SHEET; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less