This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 03/02/2023 at 10:30:49 (UTC).

PERSOLVE RECOVERIES LLC vs SIMMONS, AISHA

Case Summary

On 07/01/2021 PERSOLVE RECOVERIES LLC filed an Other lawsuit against SIMMONS, AISHA. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MONIQUE RICHARDSON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1555

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MONIQUE RICHARDSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PERSOLVE RECOVERIES LLC

Defendants

SIMMONS, AISHA

FAIN, REGGIE

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

7/1/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

7/1/2021: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

7/1/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

7/1/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

PAYMENT $320.00 RECEIPT #1579642

7/7/2021: PAYMENT $320.00 RECEIPT #1579642

UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2021-07-07

7/7/2021: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2021-07-07

RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED

11/5/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED

RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED

11/5/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED

NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SERVICE AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL

5/4/2022: NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SERVICE AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL

SUMMONS NOT ISSUED (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE, INCORRECT SUMMONS FILED FOR CASE TYPE)

5/5/2022: SUMMONS NOT ISSUED (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE, INCORRECT SUMMONS FILED FOR CASE TYPE)

PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #1637235

5/6/2022: PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #1637235

RETURNED MAIL

5/23/2022: RETURNED MAIL

ALIAS SUMMONS NOT ISSUED (PER 5/4/22 ORDER)

6/6/2022: ALIAS SUMMONS NOT ISSUED (PER 5/4/22 ORDER)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

08/28/2022

DocketDocket Code: DEACTATT; Docket Text: CASE CLOSED 30 DAYS PER RJA 2.505(F) DEACTIVATE ATTORNEY for ATT EVAN KIDD on 08/28/2022; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: ALIAS SUMMONS NOT ISSUED (PER 5/4/22 ORDER); Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/03/2022

DispositionDISPOSED BY JUDGE; Action Description: COUNTY CIVIL OVER $8,000 BUT LESS THAN $15,000; Open/Reopen Status: CLOS; Open/Reopen Date: 7/1/2021; Judge: RICHARDSON

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/23/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: RETM; Docket Text: RETURNED MAIL; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/06/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #1637235; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS NOT ISSUED (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE, INCORRECT SUMMONS FILED FOR CASE TYPE); Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: NDOD; Docket Text: NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SERVICE AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/05/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: ROSU; Docket Text: RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/05/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: ROSU; Docket Text: RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: UOCC; Docket Text: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2021-07-07; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: PAYMENT $320.00 RECEIPT #1579642; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2021

DocketDocket Code: a002; Docket Text: JUDGE RICHARDSON, MONIQUE R: ASSIGNED; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: COCOMP_SC; Docket Text: COMPLAINT; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: CCS; Docket Text: CIVIL COVER SHEET; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less