This case was last updated from Second Circuit Courts - Leon County on 05/29/2020 at 15:25:28 (UTC).

PERKINS, JONATHAN vs FIERCE ENVIRONMENTAL INC

Case Summary

On 05/05/2020 PERKINS, JONATHAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against FIERCE ENVIRONMENTAL INC. This case was filed in Second Circuit Courts - Leon County, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN COOPER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0860

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JOHN COOPER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PERKINS, JONATHAN

Defendants

PATRIOT STEEL BUILDERS LLC

FIERCE ENVIRONMENTAL INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAM A KEMPNER

313 North Monroe Street Suite 401 2813348

Tallahassee, FL 32301

 

Court Documents

RECEIPT LETTER

5/4/2020: RECEIPT LETTER

TRANSFERRED. FROM ANOTHER COUNTY

5/4/2020: TRANSFERRED. FROM ANOTHER COUNTY

PROGRESS DOCKET

5/4/2020: PROGRESS DOCKET

ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR TRANSFER VENUE GRANTED

4/30/2020: ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR TRANSFER VENUE GRANTED

MOTION FOR TRANSFER OF VENUE

4/21/2020: MOTION FOR TRANSFER OF VENUE

SUMMONS ISSUED / PATRIOT BUILDERS LLC

1/30/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED / PATRIOT BUILDERS LLC

SUMMONS ISSUED / FIERCE ENVIRONMENTAL

1/30/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED / FIERCE ENVIRONMENTAL

COMPLAINT

1/30/2020: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/30/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2020
  • DispositionAction Description: OTHER NEGLIGENCE; Open/Reopen Status: OPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 5/5/2020; Judge: COOPER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketJUDGE COOPER, JOHN C: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED. FROM ANOTHER COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROGRESS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR TRANSFER VENUE GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR TRANSFER OF VENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED / PATRIOT BUILDERS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED / FIERCE ENVIRONMENTAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KEMPNER, WILLIAM ALBERT III