This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 03/02/2023 at 08:27:02 (UTC).

MOWREY LAW FIRM vs WIER, JOEL

Case Summary

On 07/01/2021 MOWREY LAW FIRM filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WIER, JOEL. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MONIQUE RICHARDSON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1367

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MONIQUE RICHARDSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOWREY LAW FIRM

Defendant

WIER, JOEL

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

7/1/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED

7/1/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT

7/1/2021: COMPLAINT

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #1579370

7/6/2021: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #1579370

SUMMONS ISSUED (WRONG SUMMONS FOR THIS CASE TYPE)

7/6/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED (WRONG SUMMONS FOR THIS CASE TYPE)

SUMMONS ISSUED

7/8/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

LETTER / EMAIL

7/8/2021: LETTER / EMAIL

PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #1580369

7/9/2021: PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #1580369

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

8/3/2021: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

09/05/2021

DocketDocket Code: DEACTATT; Docket Text: CASE CLOSED 30 DAYS PER RJA 2.505(F) DEACTIVATE ATTORNEY for ATT RONALD MOWREY on 09/05/2021; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2021

HearingEvent: PRETRIAL SC; Start: 9:30 AM; Location: CA1; Judge: RICHARDSON; Result: CANCELLED; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2021

DispositionDISMISSED BEFORE HEARING; Action Description: SMALL CLAIMS MORE THAN $2500.00 BUT NOT MORE THAN $5000; Open/Reopen Status: CLOS; Open/Reopen Date: 7/1/2021; Judge: RICHARDSON

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: NVD; Docket Text: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/09/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #1580369; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/08/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: LETR; Docket Text: LETTER / EMAIL; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/08/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED (WRONG SUMMONS FOR THIS CASE TYPE); Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #1579370; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2021

DocketDocket Code: a002; Docket Text: JUDGE RICHARDSON, MONIQUE R: ASSIGNED; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2021

DocketDocket Code: a120; Docket Text: PRETRIAL SC SET FOR 08/24/2021 AT 9:30 AM IN CA1, JDG: RICHARDSON, MONIQUE R; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: COCOMP_SC; Docket Text: COMPLAINT; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED (WRONG SUMMONS FOR THIS CASE TYPE); Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: CCS; Docket Text: CIVIL COVER SHEET; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less