This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 02/09/2023 at 04:12:45 (UTC).

MORTGAGE ASSETS MANAGEMENT LLC vs RIDAUGHT, ELIZABETH ANN

Case Summary

On 02/01/2023 MORTGAGE ASSETS MANAGEMENT LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against RIDAUGHT, ELIZABETH ANN. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN COOPER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0205

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JOHN COOPER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MORTGAGE ASSETS MANAGEMENT, LLC

100 West Cypress Creek Road, 3275399

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309

Defendants

RIDAUGHT, ELIZABETH ANN

Tallahassee, FL 32303

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ELIZABETH ANN RIDAUGHT

Tallahassee, FL 32303

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING ON BEHALF OF SECRE

111 North Adams Street, 4 Floor 3275396

Tallahasee, FL 32301

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

Tallahassee, FL 32303

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

Tallahassee, FL 32303

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KARISSA CHIN-DUNCAN

100 W. Cypress Creek Rd., Suite 700 2620212

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

2/1/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

LIS PENDENS - Recorded (OR 5813.1733 / 20230005395)

2/1/2023: LIS PENDENS - Recorded (OR 5813.1733 / 20230005395)

MEMORANDUM

2/1/2023: MEMORANDUM

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

2/1/2023: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM FORM

2/1/2023: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM FORM

SUMMONS ISSUED

2/1/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

2/1/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

2/1/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

2/1/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

2/1/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED

CERTIFICATE

2/1/2023: CERTIFICATE

COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSURE VALUE OF THE CLAIM IS MORE THAN $50,000 BUT LESS THAN $250,000

2/1/2023: COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSURE VALUE OF THE CLAIM IS MORE THAN $50,000 BUT LESS THAN $250,000

PAYMENT $1,035.00 RECEIPT #1689114

2/2/2023: PAYMENT $1,035.00 RECEIPT #1689114

RECEIPT # 1689114 MODIFIED: PAYMENT $1,036.00

2/2/2023: RECEIPT # 1689114 MODIFIED: PAYMENT $1,036.00

UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2023-02-02

2/2/2023: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2023-02-02

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: UOCC; Docket Text: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2023-02-02; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: RECEIPT # 1689114 MODIFIED: PAYMENT $1,036.00; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: PAYMENT $1,035.00 RECEIPT #1689114; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketDocket Code: a002; Docket Text: JUDGE COOPER, JOHN C: ASSIGNED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DispositionAction Description: MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE HOMESTEAD RESIDENTIAL MORE THAN $50,000 BUT LESS THAN $250,000; Open/Reopen Status: OPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 2/1/2023 8:39:36 PM; Judge: COOPER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: MTFC2; Docket Text: COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSURE VALUE OF THE CLAIM IS MORE THAN $50,000 BUT LESS THAN $250,000; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: CERT; Docket Text: CERTIFICATE; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: VORP; Docket Text: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM FORM; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NCIF; Docket Text: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: MEMO; Docket Text: MEMORANDUM; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: LP; Docket Text: LIS PENDENS - Recorded (OR 5813.1733 / 20230005395); OR Book: 5813; OR Page: 1733; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: CCS; Docket Text: CIVIL COVER SHEET; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less