This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 06/06/2023 at 01:21:10 (UTC).

MMFII VERANDAS AT BLAIRSTONE LLC vs LINTON, JAMES ANTHONY

Case Summary

On 01/11/2023 MMFII VERANDAS AT BLAIRSTONE LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against LINTON, JAMES ANTHONY. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JASON JONES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0105

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JASON JONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MMFII VERANDAS AT BLAIRSTONE LLC

Defendants

LINTON, JAMES ANTHONY

LINTON, ANA

 

Court Documents

ORDER ON MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL

2/24/2023: ORDER ON MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL

MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL

2/6/2023: MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL

DEFAULT AND FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION - Recorded (OR 5815.259 / 20230006364)

2/3/2023: DEFAULT AND FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION - Recorded (OR 5815.259 / 20230006364)

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

1/30/2023: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

MOTION FOR JUDGMENT FOR EVICTION BY DEFAULT

1/26/2023: MOTION FOR JUDGMENT FOR EVICTION BY DEFAULT

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

1/26/2023: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

1/26/2023: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT ISSUED 1/30/23

1/26/2023: MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT ISSUED 1/30/23

COMPLAINT FILED

1/11/2023: COMPLAINT FILED

RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED-POSTED JAMES ANTHONY LINTON AND ANA LINTON

2/22/2023: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED-POSTED JAMES ANTHONY LINTON AND ANA LINTON

WRIT OF POSSESSION

2/7/2023: WRIT OF POSSESSION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

1/30/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

COPIES MAILED TO TENANT

1/17/2023: COPIES MAILED TO TENANT

RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED-POSTED A LINTON

1/17/2023: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED-POSTED A LINTON

RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED-J A LINTON

1/17/2023: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED-J A LINTON

PAYMENT $205.00 RECEIPT #1684748

1/11/2023: PAYMENT $205.00 RECEIPT #1684748

SUMMONS ISSUED

1/11/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

1/11/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2023
  • DocketDocket Code: DEACTATT; Docket Text: CASE CLOSED 30 DAYS PER RJA 2.505(F) DEACTIVATE ATTORNEY for ATT STEPHEN KNIGHT on 04/02/2023; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2023
  • DocketDocket Code: DEACTATT; Docket Text: CASE CLOSED 30 DAYS PER RJA 2.505(F) DEACTIVATE ATTORNEY for ATT ELWIN THRASHER on 04/02/2023; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DispositionDISPOSED; Action Description: REOPENED; Open/Reopen Status: REOPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 2/6/2023; Judge: JONES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: ODWC; Docket Text: ORDER ON MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: ROSE; Docket Text: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED-POSTED JAMES ANTHONY LINTON AND ANA LINTON; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: WROP; Docket Text: WRIT OF POSSESSION; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: MWAC; Docket Text: MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DispositionDEFAULT & FINAL JUDGMENT; Action Description: LANDLORD-TENANT RESIDENTIAL; Open/Reopen Status: OPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 1/11/2023; Judge: JONES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: DFFJ; Docket Text: DEFAULT AND FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION - Recorded (OR 5815.259 / 20230006364); OR Book: 5815; OR Page: 259; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: ANSW; Docket Text: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: MODEF; Docket Text: MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT ISSUED 1/30/23; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: CMTT; Docket Text: COPIES MAILED TO TENANT; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: ROSE; Docket Text: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED-POSTED A LINTON; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: ROSE; Docket Text: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED- POSTED ON J A LINTON; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: PAYMENT $205.00 RECEIPT #1684748; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: LDTN_SC; Docket Text: COMPLAINT FILED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: CCS; Docket Text: CIVIL COVER SHEET; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketDocket Code: a002; Docket Text: JUDGE JONES, JASON LEE: ASSIGNED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less