This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 02/16/2023 at 11:05:14 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. vs WILLIAMS, BARBARA R

Case Summary

On 12/02/2022 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WILLIAMS, BARBARA R. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is AUGUSTUS AIKENS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2278

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

AUGUSTUS AIKENS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.

887 Donald Ross Road, 3263052

Juno Beach, FL 33408

Defendant

WILLIAMS, BARBARA R

Tallahassee, FL 32305-1446

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JORGE L PALMA

815 Nw 57Th Ave, Suite 401 2959771

Miami, FL 33126

Defendant Attorney

ROBERT G CHURCHILL

908 Thomasville Road, 3242782

Tallahassee, FL 32303

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/1/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM/COMPLAINT

12/1/2022: STATEMENT OF CLAIM/COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/1/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #1677866

12/2/2022: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #1677866

RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - B R WILLIAMS

12/16/2022: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - B R WILLIAMS

COURT MINUTES

1/3/2023: COURT MINUTES

DEFENDANTS OBJECTION TO ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT; MOTION TO RESET PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

1/7/2023: DEFENDANTS OBJECTION TO ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT; MOTION TO RESET PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF HEARING

1/12/2023: NOTICE OF HEARING

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2023
  • HearingEvent: MOTION HEARING; Start: 10:00 AM; Location: CA1; Judge: AIKENS; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • HearingEvent: MOTION HEARING; Start: 9:30 AM; Location: CA1; Judge: AIKENS; Result: RESCHEDULED - EVENT CORRECTION; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketDocket Code: EMAIL; Docket Text: EMAIL SENT TO PALMA, JORGE L; CHURCHILL, ROBERT G JR RE SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2022 SC 002278, MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. VS. WILLIAMS, BARBARA R WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS: NOH-1/12/2023; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NOH; Docket Text: NOTICE OF HEARING; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketDocket Code: a120; Docket Text: MOTION HEARING SET FOR 03/13/2023 AT 10:00 AM IN CA1, JDG: AIKENS, AUGUSTUS D JR; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketDocket Code: a120; Docket Text: MOTION HEARING SET FOR 02/06/2023 AT 9:30 AM IN CA1, JDG: AIKENS, AUGUSTUS D JR; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketDocket Code: INFJ; Docket Text: INSTRUCTIONS FROM JUDGE - PER JUDGE AIKENS, PLEASE SET DEFENDANTS OBJECTION TO ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND MOTION TO RESET PRETRIAL CONFERENCE FOR A 15-MINUTES MOTION HEARING AND NOTICE ALL PARTIES; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: OBJE; Docket Text: DEFENDANTS OBJECTION TO ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT; MOTION TO RESET PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • HearingEvent: PRETRIAL SC; Start: 9:30 AM; Location: CA1; Judge: AIKENS; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: CTCM; Docket Text: COURT MINUTES; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: ROSE; Docket Text: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - B R WILLIAMS; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DispositionAction Description: SMALL CLAIMS MORE THAN $2500.00 BUT NOT MORE THAN $5000; Open/Reopen Status: OPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 12/2/2022; Judge: AIKENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #1677866; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketDocket Code: a002; Docket Text: JUDGE AIKENS, AUGUSTUS D JR: ASSIGNED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketDocket Code: a120; Docket Text: PRETRIAL SC SET FOR 01/03/2023 AT 9:30 AM IN CA1, JDG: AIKENS, AUGUSTUS D JR; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: COCOMP_SC; Docket Text: STATEMENT OF CLAIM/COMPLAINT; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: CCS; Docket Text: CIVIL COVER SHEET; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less