This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 09/13/2021 at 14:17:13 (UTC).

MEEKS CONSTRUCTION INC. vs WYNN, SHARON M

Case Summary

On 09/03/2021 MEEKS CONSTRUCTION INC filed an Other lawsuit against WYNN, SHARON M. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NINA ASHENAFI RICHARDSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2097

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NINA ASHENAFI RICHARDSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MEEKS CONSTRUCTION, INC.

1400 Prudential Drive, Suite 5 3175580

Jacksonville, FL 32207

Defendant

WYNN, SHARON M

Jacksonville, FL 32207

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TYLER LEE FUGITT

1400 Prudential Drive, Suite 5 3083228

Jacksonville, FL 32207

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

9/3/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM/COMPLAINT

9/3/2021: STATEMENT OF CLAIM/COMPLAINT

PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #1591426

9/11/2021: PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #1591426

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #1591426

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2021
  • DocketJUDGE ASHENAFI RICHARDSON, NINA: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DispositionAction Description: COUNTY CIVIL OVER $15,000 BUT LESS THAN $30,000; Open/Reopen Status: OPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 9/3/2021 4:52:22 PM; Judge: ASHENAFI RICHARDSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MEEKS CONSTRUCTION INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FUGITT, TYLER LEE