This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 04/03/2023 at 01:03:21 (UTC).

MCCRAY, TJUANI vs KELLEY, KEBBI

Case Summary

On 07/08/2022 MCCRAY, TJUANI filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against KELLEY, KEBBI. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ANGELA DEMPSEY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1190

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ANGELA DEMPSEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCCRAY, TJUANI

Defendant

KELLEY, KEBBI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

IMANI JERE WATERS

ADARYLL M LEE

Defendant Attorney

DANIEL M LAKE

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

3/20/2023: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION

1/5/2023: ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT KEBBI KELLEYS UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

12/8/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT KEBBI KELLEYS UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

DEFENDANT KELLEYS ANSWER AND= AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

9/6/2022: DEFENDANT KELLEYS ANSWER AND= AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE

8/5/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE

UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2022-07-08

7/8/2022: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2022-07-08

COMPLAINT

7/8/2022: COMPLAINT

DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

3/3/2023: DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

1/12/2023: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

12/15/2022: DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

DEFENDANT KEBBI KELLEYS RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

12/8/2022: DEFENDANT KEBBI KELLEYS RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

DEFENDANT KEBBI KELLEYS RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

12/8/2022: DEFENDANT KEBBI KELLEYS RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

11/21/2022: DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

NOTICE OF SERVING REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT KEBBI KELLEY

11/10/2022: NOTICE OF SERVING REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT KEBBI KELLEY

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT KEBBI KELLEY

11/10/2022: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT KEBBI KELLEY

NOTICE OF SERVING REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT KEBBI KELLEY

11/10/2022: NOTICE OF SERVING REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT KEBBI KELLEY

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO DEFENDANT

11/1/2022: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO DEFENDANT

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT

10/6/2022: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2023
  • DispositionDISMISSED BEFORE HEARING - OTHER; Action Description: AUTO NEGLIGENCE; Open/Reopen Status: CLOS; Open/Reopen Date: 7/8/2022; Judge: DEMPSEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NVD; Docket Text: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: PFS; Docket Text: DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NOTD; Docket Text: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: ORME; Docket Text: ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NOTD; Docket Text: DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RESP; Docket Text: DEFENDANT KEBBI KELLEYS RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RESP; Docket Text: DEFENDANT KEBBI KELLEYS RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NOTO; Docket Text: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT KEBBI KELLEYS UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NOPR; Docket Text: DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: AAAD; Docket Text: DEFENDANT KELLEYS ANSWER AND= AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #1655681; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: AFNS; Docket Text: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: UOCC; Docket Text: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2022-07-08; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #1650104; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: COMP_CA; Docket Text: COMPLAINT; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: CCS; Docket Text: CIVIL COVER SHEET; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketDocket Code: a002; Docket Text: JUDGE DEMPSEY, ANGELA C: ASSIGNED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less