This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 01/17/2023 at 05:50:28 (UTC).

MCCRAY, TJUANI vs KELLEY, KEBBI

Case Summary

On 07/08/2022 MCCRAY, TJUANI filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against KELLEY, KEBBI. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ANGELA DEMPSEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1190

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ANGELA DEMPSEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCCRAY, TJUANI

Tallahassee, FL 32352

Defendant

KELLEY, KEBBI

Tallahassee, FL 32308

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

IMANI JERE WATERS

1030 E. Lafayette Street, Suite 6 3164138

Tallahassee, FL 32301

ADARYLL M LEE

1030 East Lafayette Street Ste 6, 3107520

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Defendant Attorney

DANIEL M LAKE

200 W. Forsyth Street, Ste 1020 3234020

Jacksonville, FL 32246

 

Court Documents

ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION

1/5/2023: ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION

DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

12/15/2022: DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

DEFENDANT KEBBI KELLEYS RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

12/8/2022: DEFENDANT KEBBI KELLEYS RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

DEFENDANT KEBBI KELLEYS RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

12/8/2022: DEFENDANT KEBBI KELLEYS RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT KEBBI KELLEYS UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

12/8/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT KEBBI KELLEYS UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

11/21/2022: DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

NOTICE OF SERVING REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT KEBBI KELLEY

11/10/2022: NOTICE OF SERVING REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT KEBBI KELLEY

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT KEBBI KELLEY

11/10/2022: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT KEBBI KELLEY

NOTICE OF SERVING REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT KEBBI KELLEY

11/10/2022: NOTICE OF SERVING REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT KEBBI KELLEY

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO DEFENDANT

11/1/2022: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO DEFENDANT

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT

10/6/2022: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ADMISSIONS IN RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

10/6/2022: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ADMISSIONS IN RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DOCUMENTS IN RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

10/6/2022: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DOCUMENTS IN RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

DEFENDANTS REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF, TJUANI MCCRAY

9/6/2022: DEFENDANTS REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF, TJUANI MCCRAY

DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE

9/6/2022: DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE

DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

9/6/2022: DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF SERVICE EMAIL ADDRESS

9/6/2022: DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF SERVICE EMAIL ADDRESS

DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, TJUANI MCCRAY

9/6/2022: DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, TJUANI MCCRAY

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: ORME; Docket Text: ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NOTD; Docket Text: DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RESP; Docket Text: DEFENDANT KEBBI KELLEYS RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RESP; Docket Text: DEFENDANT KEBBI KELLEYS RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NOTO; Docket Text: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT KEBBI KELLEYS UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NOPR; Docket Text: DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NOTO; Docket Text: NOTICE OF SERVING REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT KEBBI KELLEY; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NOTO; Docket Text: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT KEBBI KELLEY; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NOTO; Docket Text: NOTICE OF SERVING REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT KEBBI KELLEY; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NOTO; Docket Text: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO DEFENDANT; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #1655681; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: AFNS; Docket Text: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DispositionAction Description: AUTO NEGLIGENCE; Open/Reopen Status: OPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 7/8/2022; Judge: DEMPSEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: UOCC; Docket Text: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2022-07-08; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #1650104; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: COMP_CA; Docket Text: COMPLAINT; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: CCS; Docket Text: CIVIL COVER SHEET; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketDocket Code: a002; Docket Text: JUDGE DEMPSEY, ANGELA C: ASSIGNED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer IMANI JERE WATERS

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ADARYLL M LEE