This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 12/30/2022 at 11:14:27 (UTC).

MCCRAY, JYMIE vs STTRICKLAND, FRANK

Case Summary

On 06/23/2022 MCCRAY, JYMIE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STTRICKLAND, FRANK. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN COOPER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1073

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JOHN COOPER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCCRAY, JYMIE

Qunicy, FL 32351

Defendants

B&L SERVICES INC

3491 West Pensacola Street, 3232427

Tallahassee, FL 32304

STTRICKLAND, FRANK

Tallahassee, FL 32303

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FRED E PEARSON

1437 Market Street, 3236239

Tallahassee, FL 32312

STEPHEN RA KNIGHT

130 Salem Court, 3062945

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Defendant Attorneys

L. JOHNSON SARBER

208 N. Laura Street, Suite 1100 3117328

Jacksonville, FL 32202

MICHAEL DICKEY

208 North Laura Street, Suite 1100, 3250404

Jacksonville, FL 32202

MEGHAN KAYE BRADLEY

208 North Laura Street, Suite 1100, 3257088

Jacksonville, FL 32202

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

6/23/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

6/23/2022: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

6/23/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

6/23/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

6/23/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

PAYMENT $430.00 RECEIPT #1647327

6/23/2022: PAYMENT $430.00 RECEIPT #1647327

UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2022-06-23

6/23/2022: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2022-06-23

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND EMAIL ADDRESS

6/24/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND EMAIL ADDRESS

DEFENDANTS B&L SERVICES, INC AKA CAPITAL TRANSPORTATION, INC ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

7/25/2022: DEFENDANTS B&L SERVICES, INC AKA CAPITAL TRANSPORTATION, INC ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - FRANK STRICKLAND

9/26/2022: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - FRANK STRICKLAND

RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED- JOHN CAMILLO

9/26/2022: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED- JOHN CAMILLO

DEFENDANT FRANK STRICKLANDS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

9/27/2022: DEFENDANT FRANK STRICKLANDS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF SERVING DEFENDANTS, B&L SERVICES, INC AKA CAPITAL TRANSPORTATION, INC AND FRANK STRICKLAND, FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF JYMIE MCCRAY

9/27/2022: NOTICE OF SERVING DEFENDANTS, B&L SERVICES, INC AKA CAPITAL TRANSPORTATION, INC AND FRANK STRICKLAND, FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF JYMIE MCCRAY

DEFENDANTS, B&L SERVICES, INC AKA CAPITAL TRANSPORTATION, INC AND FRANK STRICKLAND FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF JYMIE MCCRAY

9/27/2022: DEFENDANTS, B&L SERVICES, INC AKA CAPITAL TRANSPORTATION, INC AND FRANK STRICKLAND FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF JYMIE MCCRAY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY AND SECONDARY ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSES FOR SERVICE OF PLEADINGS

10/28/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY AND SECONDARY ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSES FOR SERVICE OF PLEADINGS

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NAPR; Docket Text: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY AND SECONDARY ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSES FOR SERVICE OF PLEADINGS; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RQPR; Docket Text: DEFENDANTS, B&L SERVICES, INC AKA CAPITAL TRANSPORTATION, INC AND FRANK STRICKLAND FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF JYMIE MCCRAY; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NSOI; Docket Text: NOTICE OF SERVING DEFENDANTS, B&L SERVICES, INC AKA CAPITAL TRANSPORTATION, INC AND FRANK STRICKLAND, FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF JYMIE MCCRAY; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: AAAD; Docket Text: DEFENDANT FRANK STRICKLANDS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: ROSE; Docket Text: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED- JOHN CAMILLO; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: ROSE; Docket Text: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - FRANK STRICKLAND; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: AAAD; Docket Text: DEFENDANTS B&L SERVICES, INC AKA CAPITAL TRANSPORTATION, INC ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: DOEA; Docket Text: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND EMAIL ADDRESS; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DispositionAction Description: AUTO NEGLIGENCE; Open/Reopen Status: OPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 6/23/2022; Judge: COOPER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: UOCC; Docket Text: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2022-06-23; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: PAYMENT $430.00 RECEIPT #1647327; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: COMP_CA; Docket Text: COMPLAINT; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: CCS; Docket Text: CIVIL COVER SHEET; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketDocket Code: a002; Docket Text: JUDGE COOPER, JOHN C: ASSIGNED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where B & L Services Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PEARSON, FRED EUGENE