This case was last updated from Second Circuit Courts - Leon County on 10/12/2021 at 15:06:41 (UTC).

MCCORD, VANTESHA vs WESTMINSTER COMMUNITIES INC

Case Summary

On 10/07/2021 MCCORD, VANTESHA filed an Other lawsuit against WESTMINSTER COMMUNITIES INC. This case was filed in Second Circuit Courts - Leon County, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is J SMITH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1743

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

J SMITH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCCORD, VANTESHA

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Defendant

WESTMINSTER COMMUNITIES INC

4449 Meadering Way 3181313

Tallahassee, FL 32308

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARIE A MATTOX

203 North Gadsden Street 3020373

Tallahassee, FL 32301

 

Court Documents

UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2021-10-11

10/11/2021: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2021-10-11

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #1596923

10/11/2021: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #1596923

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/7/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT

10/7/2021: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/7/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2021-10-11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #1596923

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketJUDGE SMITH, J LAYNE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DispositionAction Description: OTHER DISCRIMINATION; Open/Reopen Status: OPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 10/7/2021; Judge: SMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MATTOX, MARIE A