This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 02/06/2023 at 09:26:34 (UTC).

MCCALL, TAMARA vs FULLMORE, JALEANNA

Case Summary

On 12/15/2022 MCCALL, TAMARA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against FULLMORE, JALEANNA. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN COOPER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2210

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JOHN COOPER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCCALL, TAMARA

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Defendant

FULLMORE, JALEANNA

Tallahassee, FL 32305

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/15/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

12/15/2022: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/15/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #1680714

12/16/2022: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #1680714

UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2022-12-16

12/16/2022: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2022-12-16

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

1/5/2023: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2023
  • DocketDocket Code: DEACTATT; Docket Text: CASE CLOSED 30 DAYS PER RJA 2.505(F) DEACTIVATE ATTORNEY for ATT IMANI WATERS on 02/05/2023; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DispositionDISMISSED BEFORE HEARING - OTHER; Action Description: AUTO NEGLIGENCE; Open/Reopen Status: CLOS; Open/Reopen Date: 12/15/2022 4:01:38 PM; Judge: COOPER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NVD; Docket Text: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: UOCC; Docket Text: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2022-12-16; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #1680714; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketDocket Code: a002; Docket Text: JUDGE COOPER, JOHN C: ASSIGNED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: COMP_CA; Docket Text: COMPLAINT; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: CCS; Docket Text: CIVIL COVER SHEET; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less