This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 10/07/2020 at 15:19:03 (UTC).

LANG, CLAIRE vs DEVORO HOMES LLC

Case Summary

On 09/30/2020 LANG, CLAIRE filed an Other lawsuit against DEVORO HOMES LLC. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JASON JONES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1770

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JASON JONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LANG, CLAIRE

Tallahassee, FL 32304

Defendants

2-10 HOME BUYERS WARRANTY OF VIRGINIA INC

2675 S. Abilene Street 3116441

Aurora, CO 80014

DEVORO HOMES LLC

2810 Remington Green Circle 3116440

Tallahassee, FL 32308

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARTIN SIPPLE

Po Box 3912478925

Tallahassee, FL 32302

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

9/30/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM/COMPLAINT

9/30/2020: STATEMENT OF CLAIM/COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

9/30/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

9/30/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED

PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #1531504

10/5/2020: PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #1531504

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #1531504

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketJUDGE JONES, JASON LEE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DispositionAction Description: COUNTY CIVIL OVER $15,000 BUT LESS THAN $30,000; Open/Reopen Status: OPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 9/30/2020; Judge: JONES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 2-10 HOME BUYERS WARRANTY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIPPLE, MARTIN