This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 04/29/2020 at 12:04:07 (UTC).

LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC vs KNOX, JACQUELINE ANN

Case Summary

On 08/30/2018 LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against KNOX, JACQUELINE ANN. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are JAMES SHELFER and RONALD FLURY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1941

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

JAMES SHELFER

RONALD FLURY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC

225 E Robinson St Ste 6602760347

Orlando, FL 32801

Defendants

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ANNE PASCUCCI

Newport News, VA 23601

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

Tallahassee, FL 32303

CITY OF TALLAHASSEE

300 South Adams Street B-27 2773175

Tallahassee, FL 32301

KNOX, JACQUELINE ANN

Liberty Township, OH 45044

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY

300 S. Adams St C/O City Commissioner 2987397

Tallahassee, FL 32301

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1

Tallahassee, FL 32303

MALONEY, SUZANNE

Albany, NY 12211

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF SUZANNE MALONEY

Albany, NY 12211

SHADOWLAWN HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

Skip Trace 2987396

Tallahassee, FL 32303

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JACQUELINE ANN KNOX

Liberty Township, OH 45044

DEPT OF REVENUE

Tallahassee, FL 32399

ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIMING BY THROUGH, U

PASCUCCI, ANNE

Newport News, VA 23601

CHARLES, PADMINI

Festus, MO 63028

Not Yet Classified

MAJESTIC RE FUND, LLC

P.O. Box 14274 3078169

Tallahassee, FL 32317

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2020
  • HearingEvent: FORECLOSURE SALE; Start: 11:00 AM; Location: 100; Judge: FORECLOSURE SALE; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • HearingEvent: MOTION HEARING; Start: 10:00 AM; Location: 365A; Judge: FLURY; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DispositionDISPOSED BY JUDGE; Action Description: MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE HOMESTEAD RESIDENTIAL MORE THAN $50,000 BUT LESS THAN $250,000; Open/Reopen Status: CLOS; Open/Reopen Date: 8/30/2018; Judge: FLURY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF TALLAHASSEE is a litigant

Latest cases where Unite States of America Dept of Treasury is a litigant

Latest cases where Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC is a litigant