This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 03/13/2023 at 01:26:54 (UTC).

KAVARTHAPU, NARESH vs CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A.

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 KAVARTHAPU, NARESH filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against CAPITAL ONE BANK USA N A. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ANGELA DEMPSEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0076

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ANGELA DEMPSEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KAVARTHAPU, NARESH

Tallahassee, FL 32309

Defendant

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

1680 Capital One Drive, 3270552

Mclean, VA 22102

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JAMES CRIT THOMPSON

3520 Thomasville Road, Fourth Floor 2861947

Tallahassee, FL 32309

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/13/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSURE VALUE OF THE CLAIM IS MORE THAN $50,000 BUT LESS THAN $250,000

1/13/2023: COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSURE VALUE OF THE CLAIM IS MORE THAN $50,000 BUT LESS THAN $250,000

LIS PENDENS - Recorded (OR 5808.2316 / 20230002083)

1/13/2023: LIS PENDENS - Recorded (OR 5808.2316 / 20230002083)

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM FORM

1/13/2023: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM FORM

SUMMONS ISSUED

1/13/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED

PAYMENT $905.00 RECEIPT #1685350

1/13/2023: PAYMENT $905.00 RECEIPT #1685350

UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2023-01-16

1/16/2023: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2023-01-16

RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED-ANTHONIO DI PAOLO

2/6/2023: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED-ANTHONIO DI PAOLO

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT ISSUED 2/16/2023

2/15/2023: MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT ISSUED 2/16/2023

PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT OF REFORECLOSURE

2/21/2023: PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT OF REFORECLOSURE

NOTICE OF HEARING

2/27/2023: NOTICE OF HEARING

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2023
  • HearingEvent: MOTION HEARING; Start: 4:30 PM; Location: Tele; Judge: DEMPSEY; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketDocket Code: a120; Docket Text: MOTION HEARING SET FOR 04/13/2023 AT 4:30 PM IN TELE, JDG: DEMPSEY, ANGELA C; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NOH; Docket Text: NOTICE OF HEARING; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: MFSJ; Docket Text: PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT OF REFORECLOSURE; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: MODEF; Docket Text: MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT ISSUED 2/16/2023; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: ROSE; Docket Text: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED-ANTHONIO DI PAOLO; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: UOCC; Docket Text: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2023-01-16; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DispositionAction Description: MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE NON-HOMESTEAD RESIDENTIAL MORE THAN $50,000 BUT LESS THAN $250,000; Open/Reopen Status: OPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 1/13/2023; Judge: DEMPSEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: PAYMENT $905.00 RECEIPT #1685350; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: VORP; Docket Text: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM FORM; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: LP; Docket Text: LIS PENDENS - Recorded (OR 5808.2316 / 20230002083); OR Book: 5808; OR Page: 2316; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: MTFC2; Docket Text: COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSURE VALUE OF THE CLAIM IS MORE THAN $50,000 BUT LESS THAN $250,000; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: CCS; Docket Text: CIVIL COVER SHEET; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDocket Code: a002; Docket Text: JUDGE DEMPSEY, ANGELA C: ASSIGNED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less