This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 11/24/2022 at 11:08:28 (UTC).

JOSEPH D MILLER DC PA vs DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/27/2022 JOSEPH D MILLER DC PA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is AUGUSTUS AIKENS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1781

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

AUGUSTUS AIKENS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOSEPH D MILLER DC PA

Boca Raton, FL 33431

Defendant

DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

C/O Florida Chief Financial Officer As Ra, Service Process Station, P.O. Box 6200 3250397

Tallahassee, FL 32314-6200

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ABRAHAM OVADIA

4800 N Federal Hwy, Suite D204 2585618

Boca Raton, FL 33431

CHRIS KASPER

4800 N Federal Hwy Suite D204, 2955601

Boca Raton, FL 33431

ALLEGRA CLEMENTE

4800 N Federal Hwy, Suite D204 3208669

Boca Raton, FL 33431

Defendant Attorney

STEPHANIE BALCAZAR

412 East Madison Street, Suite 815 3256754

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THE ISSUE OF THE PRE SUIT DEMAND LETTER AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT THEREOF

11/8/2022: PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THE ISSUE OF THE PRE SUIT DEMAND LETTER AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT THEREOF

PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THE ISSUE OF STANDING AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT THEREOF

11/8/2022: PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THE ISSUE OF STANDING AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT THEREOF

NOTICE OF FILING ADJUSTER CODE OF ETHICS

11/8/2022: NOTICE OF FILING ADJUSTER CODE OF ETHICS

NOTICE OF FILING 2021 PIP STATUTE

11/8/2022: NOTICE OF FILING 2021 PIP STATUTE

DEFENDANTS MOTION TO APPEAR ELECTRONICALLY AT THE JANUARY 4, 2023 HEARING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS

11/1/2022: DEFENDANTS MOTION TO APPEAR ELECTRONICALLY AT THE JANUARY 4, 2023 HEARING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

10/28/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

10/28/2022: NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF HEARING

10/28/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING

COURT MINUTES

10/25/2022: COURT MINUTES

DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS

10/24/2022: DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS

ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION FOR WAIVER OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE AND INVOKING THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

10/24/2022: ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION FOR WAIVER OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE AND INVOKING THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT

10/24/2022: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT

JOINT STIPULATION FOR WAIVER OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE AND INVOKING THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

10/19/2022: JOINT STIPULATION FOR WAIVER OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE AND INVOKING THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

10/18/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #1665347

9/27/2022: PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #1665347

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND EMAIL ADDRESS

9/27/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND EMAIL ADDRESS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

9/27/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

9/27/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2023
  • HearingEvent: MOTION HEARING; Start: 10:15 AM; Location: CA1; Judge: AIKENS; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: MFSJ; Docket Text: PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THE ISSUE OF THE PRE SUIT DEMAND LETTER AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT THEREOF; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: MFSJ; Docket Text: PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THE ISSUE OF STANDING AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT THEREOF; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NOF; Docket Text: NOTICE OF FILING ADJUSTER CODE OF ETHICS; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NOF; Docket Text: NOTICE OF FILING 2021 PIP STATUTE; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: MFTH; Docket Text: DEFENDANTS MOTION TO APPEAR ELECTRONICALLY AT THE JANUARY 4, 2023 HEARING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NSOP; Docket Text: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NSOP; Docket Text: NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketDocket Code: EMAIL; Docket Text: EMAIL SENT TO KASPER, CHRIS; BALCAZAR, STEPHANIE RE SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2022 SC 001781, JOSEPH D MILLER DC PA VS. DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS: NOH-10/28/2022; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NOH; Docket Text: NOTICE OF HEARING; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #1665347; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: DOEA; Docket Text: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND EMAIL ADDRESS; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RQAD; Docket Text: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RQPR; Docket Text: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NSOI; Docket Text: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: COMP_SC; Docket Text: STATEMENT OF CLAIM; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: CCS; Docket Text: CIVIL COVER SHEET; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketDocket Code: a002; Docket Text: JUDGE AIKENS, AUGUSTUS D JR: ASSIGNED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketDocket Code: a120; Docket Text: PRETRIAL SC SET FOR 10/25/2022 AT 9:30 AM IN CA1, JDG: AIKENS, AUGUSTUS D JR; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Direct General Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CLEMENTE , ALLEGRA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OVADIA, ABRAHAM

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KASPER , CHRIS