This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 01/24/2023 at 02:13:21 (UTC).

JOHNSON, KALEB vs RAMEY, KE CHERELLE

Case Summary

On 12/02/2022 JOHNSON, KALEB filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RAMEY, KE CHERELLE. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN COOPER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2109

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JOHN COOPER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOHNSON, KALEB

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Defendant

RAMEY, KE CHERELLE

Tallahassee, FL 32303

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANNA R NORRIS

313 N Monroe St., Suite 401, 3133588

Tallahassee, FL 32301

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/2/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

12/2/2022: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/2/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

12/2/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

12/2/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

12/2/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #1678166

12/5/2022: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #1678166

UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2022-12-05

12/5/2022: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2022-12-05

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: UOCC; Docket Text: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2022-12-05; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #1678166; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketDocket Code: a002; Docket Text: JUDGE COOPER, JOHN C: ASSIGNED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DispositionAction Description: AUTO NEGLIGENCE; Open/Reopen Status: OPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 12/2/2022 4:57:24 PM; Judge: COOPER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NSOI; Docket Text: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RQPR; Docket Text: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RQAD; Docket Text: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: COMP_CA; Docket Text: COMPLAINT; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: CCS; Docket Text: CIVIL COVER SHEET; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less