This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 03/15/2023 at 01:23:17 (UTC).

JASON WILLIAMS AS PARENT/GUARDIAN OFT W MINOR vs FUN STATION INC

Case Summary

On 10/28/2022 JASON WILLIAMS AS PARENT/GUARDIAN OFT W MINOR filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against FUN STATION INC. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ANGELA DEMPSEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1930

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ANGELA DEMPSEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JASON WILLIAMS AS PARENT/GUARDIAN OF T W MINOR

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Defendant

FUN STATION INC

2821 Sharer Road, 3257165

Tallahassee, FL 32312

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHN FOOTE

313 North Monroe St, Ste 401 3203867

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Defendant Attorneys

ABBY J GOLDMAN

222 Lakeview Avenue, Suite 120, 3273349

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

DENNIS J EGITTO

222 Lakeview Avenue, Suite 120 3273348

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/28/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/28/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT

10/28/2022: COMPLAINT

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND EMAIL ADDRESS

10/28/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND EMAIL ADDRESS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

10/28/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

10/28/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

10/28/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #1672002

10/31/2022: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #1672002

UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2022-10-31

10/31/2022: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2022-10-31

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

1/25/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED-FUN STATION, INC

1/30/2023: RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED-FUN STATION, INC

DEFENDANT, FUN STATION, INCS, REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF

2/28/2023: DEFENDANT, FUN STATION, INCS, REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF

DEFENDANT, FUN STATION, INCS, INITIAL INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

2/28/2023: DEFENDANT, FUN STATION, INCS, INITIAL INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

DEFENDANT, FUN STATION, INCS, COLLATERAL SOURCE INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

2/28/2023: DEFENDANT, FUN STATION, INCS, COLLATERAL SOURCE INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

DEFENDANT, FUN STATION, INCS, FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF

2/28/2023: DEFENDANT, FUN STATION, INCS, FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF

DEFENDANT, FUN STATION, INCS, ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO THE PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

2/28/2023: DEFENDANT, FUN STATION, INCS, ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO THE PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: AAAD; Docket Text: DEFENDANT, FUN STATION, INCS, ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO THE PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RQPR; Docket Text: DEFENDANT, FUN STATION, INCS, FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NSOI; Docket Text: DEFENDANT, FUN STATION, INCS, COLLATERAL SOURCE INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NSOI; Docket Text: DEFENDANT, FUN STATION, INCS, INITIAL INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RQAD; Docket Text: DEFENDANT, FUN STATION, INCS, REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: ROSU; Docket Text: RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED-FUN STATION, INC; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NAPR; Docket Text: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: UOCC; Docket Text: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2022-10-31; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #1672002; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketDocket Code: a002; Docket Text: JUDGE DEMPSEY, ANGELA C: ASSIGNED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DispositionAction Description: NEGLIGENCE PREMISES LIABILITY COMMERCIAL; Open/Reopen Status: OPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 10/28/2022; Judge: DEMPSEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RQAD; Docket Text: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NSOI; Docket Text: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RQPR; Docket Text: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: DOEA; Docket Text: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND EMAIL ADDRESS; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: COMP_CA; Docket Text: COMPLAINT; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: CCS; Docket Text: CIVIL COVER SHEET; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less