This case was last updated from Leon County - Second Judicial Circuit Court on 11/25/2023 at 01:09:05 (UTC).

GREEN, WAYNE vs DOLLAR TREE STORES INC.

Case Summary

On 07/01/2021 GREEN, WAYNE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DOLLAR TREE STORES INC. This case was filed in Leon County - Second Judicial Circuit Court, Leon County Courthouse located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ANGELA DEMPSEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1174

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ANGELA DEMPSEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GREEN, WAYNE

Defendant

DOLLAR TREE STORES, INC.

 

Court Documents

ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTIO NTO ENFORCE PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT FOR AN AWARE OF FEES AND TAXATION OF COSTS

3/30/2023: ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTIO NTO ENFORCE PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT FOR AN AWARE OF FEES AND TAXATION OF COSTS

DEFENDANTS MOTION TO ENFORCE PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT FOR AN AWARD OF FEES AND TAXATION OF COSTS

1/6/2023: DEFENDANTS MOTION TO ENFORCE PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT FOR AN AWARD OF FEES AND TAXATION OF COSTS

DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF OBJECTIONS AND MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AS TO PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONS DUCES TECUM OF JEFF BUNDT AND TAMIKA HALL

10/7/2022: DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF OBJECTIONS AND MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AS TO PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONS DUCES TECUM OF JEFF BUNDT AND TAMIKA HALL

ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

8/10/2022: ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

3/25/2022: DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO DEFENDANTS INTERROGATORIES

12/9/2021: NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO DEFENDANTS INTERROGATORIES

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

8/4/2021: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2021-07-06

7/6/2021: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2021-07-06

NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO ENFORCE PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT FOR AN AWARD OF FEES AND TAXATION OF COSTS

1/18/2023: NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO ENFORCE PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT FOR AN AWARD OF FEES AND TAXATION OF COSTS

FINAL JUDGMENT - Recorded (OR 5890.205 / 20230053317)

10/2/2023: FINAL JUDGMENT - Recorded (OR 5890.205 / 20230053317)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY AND SECONDARY ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSES FOR SERVICE OF PLEADINGS

9/30/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY AND SECONDARY ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSES FOR SERVICE OF PLEADINGS

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

9/22/2023: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING

7/24/2023: NOTICE OF HEARING

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

7/19/2023: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

6/23/2023: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING

3/16/2023: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL

1/13/2023: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONS DUCES TECUM

9/27/2022: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONS DUCES TECUM

66 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/05/2023

DocketDocket Code: DEACTATT; Docket Text: CASE CLOSED 30 DAYS PER RJA 2.505(F) DEACTIVATE ATTORNEY for ATT MICHAEL GAGLIARDI on 11/05/2023; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/05/2023

DocketDocket Code: DEACTATT; Docket Text: CASE CLOSED 30 DAYS PER RJA 2.505(F) DEACTIVATE ATTORNEY for ATT JOHN VAN HISE on 11/05/2023; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/05/2023

DocketDocket Code: DEACTATT; Docket Text: CASE CLOSED 30 DAYS PER RJA 2.505(F) DEACTIVATE ATTORNEY for ATT KAYLA SCARPONE on 11/05/2023; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2023

DispositionDISPOSED; Action Description: REOPENED; Open/Reopen Status: REOPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 1/6/2023; Judge: DEMPSEY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: FIJU; Docket Text: FINAL JUDGMENT - Recorded (OR 5890.205 / 20230053317); OR Book: 5890; OR Page: 205; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/30/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: NAPR; Docket Text: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY AND SECONDARY ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSES FOR SERVICE OF PLEADINGS; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023

HearingEvent: MOTION HEARING; Start: 10:00 AM; Location: ZOOMC; Judge: DEMPSEY; Result: CANCELLED; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: NCNH; Docket Text: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2023

DocketDocket Code: a120; Docket Text: MOTION HEARING SET FOR 09/27/2023 AT 10:00 AM IN ZOOMC, JDG: DEMPSEY, ANGELA C; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: NOH; Docket Text: NOTICE OF HEARING; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
84 More Docket Entries
07/21/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: NAPR; Docket Text: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY AND SECONDARY ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSES FOR SERVICE OF PLEADINGS; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: UOCC; Docket Text: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2021-07-06; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #1579584; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2021

DocketDocket Code: a002; Docket Text: JUDGE DEMPSEY, ANGELA C: ASSIGNED; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: NSOI; Docket Text: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: RQPR; Docket Text: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: RQAD; Docket Text: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: COMP_CA; Docket Text: COMPLAINT; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: CCS; Docket Text: CIVIL COVER SHEET; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less