This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 06/15/2023 at 01:34:35 (UTC).

GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY vs SMOAKS, JAMES

Case Summary

On 07/01/2021 GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY filed an Other lawsuit against SMOAKS, JAMES. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NINA ASHENAFI RICHARDSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1527

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NINA ASHENAFI RICHARDSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

SMOAKS, JAMES

SMOAKS, JASMINA SHANELLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JESSIE E BOWDEN

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH

10/19/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH

AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE

10/19/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE

MOTION FOR DEFAULT - CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE PER FS 48.161

9/23/2022: MOTION FOR DEFAULT - CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE PER FS 48.161

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

9/23/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AS TO JAMES SMOAKS (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE, DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ISSUED)

8/18/2022: MOTION FOR DEFAULT AS TO JAMES SMOAKS (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE, DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ISSUED)

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

8/18/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE NOT TO DISMISS CASE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION

8/5/2022: SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE NOT TO DISMISS CASE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION

AMENDED COMPLAINT

7/25/2022: AMENDED COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SERVICE AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL

7/12/2022: NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SERVICE AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

9/15/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF FILING

9/15/2022: NOTICE OF FILING

PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #1655562

8/8/2022: PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #1655562

ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED - JASMINA SMOAKS

8/5/2022: ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED - JASMINA SMOAKS

RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED

11/19/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED

PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #1594654

9/29/2021: PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #1594654

SUMMONS ISSUED

9/27/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - JAMES SMOAKS

8/25/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - JAMES SMOAKS

PAYMENT $320.00 RECEIPT #1578987

7/1/2021: PAYMENT $320.00 RECEIPT #1578987

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/19/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: AODS; Docket Text: AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: AFFD; Docket Text: AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/23/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: MODEF; Docket Text: MOTION FOR DEFAULT - CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE PER FS 48.161; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/23/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: AFNM; Docket Text: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: NSOP; Docket Text: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: NOF; Docket Text: NOTICE OF FILING; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/18/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: MODEF; Docket Text: MOTION FOR DEFAULT AS TO JAMES SMOAKS (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE, DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ISSUED); Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/18/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: AFNM; Docket Text: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #1655562; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/05/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED - JASMINA SMOAKS; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
09/13/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: MODEF; Docket Text: MOTION FOR DEFAULT (JAMES SMOAKS) / ISSUED 9/15/2021; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: ROSE; Docket Text: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - JAMES SMOAKS; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2021

DispositionAction Description: COUNTY CIVIL OVER $8,000 BUT LESS THAN $15,000; Open/Reopen Status: OPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 7/1/2021; Judge: ASHENAFI RICHARDSON

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: UOCC; Docket Text: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2021-07-01; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: PAYMENT $320.00 RECEIPT #1578987; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2021

DocketDocket Code: a002; Docket Text: JUDGE ASHENAFI RICHARDSON, NINA: ASSIGNED; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: COCOMP_SC; Docket Text: STATEMENT OF CLAIM/COMPLAINT; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: CCS; Docket Text: CIVIL COVER SHEET; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less