This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 08/03/2020 at 14:08:02 (UTC).

GERSON, AARON vs MEEKS ONSTRUCTION INC

Case Summary

On 07/10/2020 GERSON, AARON filed an Other lawsuit against MEEKS ONSTRUCTION INC. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is J SMITH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1336

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

J SMITH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GERSON, AARON

Tallahassee, FL 32303

Defendant

MEEKS ONSTRUCTION INC

7025 Spring Hill Road 3104425

Tallahassee, FL 32305

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DANIEL I PHILLIPS

1115 North Gadsden Street 3050780

Tallahassee, FL 32303

Defendant Attorney

DAVID K MINACCI

140-D West 1St Street 3001348

St George Island, FL 32328

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING

7/30/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION TO DISMISS

7/27/2020: MOTION TO DISMISS

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #1519016

7/10/2020: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #1519016

SUMMONS ISSUED

7/10/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM/COMPLAINT

7/10/2020: STATEMENT OF CLAIM/COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

7/10/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2020
  • HearingEvent: MOTION HEARING; Start: 2:30 PM; Location: TELE; Judge: SMITH; Source: BM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketEMAIL SENT TO MINACCI, DAVID K; PHILLIPS, DANIEL I RE SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2020 CC 001336, GERSON, AARON VS. MEEKS ONSTRUCTION INC WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS: NOH-7/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketMOTION HEARING SET FOR 08/17/2020 AT 2:30 PM IN TELE, JDG: SMITH, J LAYNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketINSTRUCTIONS FROM JUDGE - PLEASE SET THE MOTION TO DISMISS FOR A 30 MINUTE HEARING ON JUDGE SMITHS AUGUST 17 @ 2:30 DOCKET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DispositionAction Description: COUNTY CIVIL OVER $8,000 BUT LESS THAN $15,000; Open/Reopen Status: OPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 7/10/2020; Judge: SMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #1519016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketJUDGE SMITH, J LAYNE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MEEKS CONSTRUCTION INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David K Minacci