Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 10/06/2020 at 15:44:52 (UTC).

GALEANO, REBECCA vs WALTER, SANDRA

Case Summary

On 08/06/2020 GALEANO, REBECCA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against WALTER, SANDRA. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ANGELA DEMPSEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1446

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Leon County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ANGELA DEMPSEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GALEANO, REBECCA

Tallahassee, FL 32309

Defendant

WALTER, SANDRA

Coral Gables, FL 33146

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TYLER B EVERETT

313 North Monroe Street Suite 401 2707857

Tallahassee, FL 32301

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF NON-OBJECTION AND REQUEST FOR COPIES

9/30/2020: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF NON-OBJECTION AND REQUEST FOR COPIES

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES

9/29/2020: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

9/29/2020: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

9/29/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED

9/29/2020: NOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE

9/29/2020: REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

9/24/2020: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE

9/10/2020: NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #1522754

8/6/2020: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #1522754

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

8/6/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE TO PRODUCE

8/6/2020: NOTICE TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

8/6/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

SUMMONS ISSUED

8/6/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT

8/6/2020: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

8/6/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF NON-OBJECTION AND REQUEST FOR COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DispositionAction Description: AUTO NEGLIGENCE; Open/Reopen Status: OPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 8/6/2020; Judge: DEMPSEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #1522754

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketJUDGE DEMPSEY, ANGELA C: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TYLER B EVERETT