Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 04/30/2020 at 17:06:44 (UTC).

FLORIGROWN LLC vs DEPT OF HEALTH OFFICE OF MEDICAL MARIJUANA USE

Case Summary

On 12/13/2017 FLORIGROWN LLC filed a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit against DEPT OF HEALTH OFFICE OF MEDICAL MARIJUANA USE. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are TERRY LEWIS and CHARLES DODSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2549

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

  • Court:

    Leon County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

TERRY LEWIS

CHARLES DODSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PUREFLORIDA, LLC

5301 N Habana Unit 3 Apt, Suite, Bldg. (Optional) 3012013

Tampa, FL 33614

Not Yet Classified

KABO INVESTMENTS INC

TROPIFLORA LLC

1307 MOSSO LLC

RECORD BUCK FARMS INC

22900 North Buckhill Road 3028429

Howey-In-The-Hills, FL 34737-4700

FLORIDA ALTERNATIVE MEDICINE INC

HOLLY HILL FRUIT PRODUCTS CO INC

KNY MEDICAL CARE LLC

JEMMSTONE GROUP LLC

123 North Monroe Street 3010682

Tallahassee, FL 32301

OASIS GARDEN INC

3560 Nw 115Th Avenue Suite A 3026503

Doral, FL 33178

KMC CITRUS ENTERPRISES INC

16425 Sr 42Nd East 2996592

Weirsdale, FL 32195

MECCA FARMS INC

106 E. College Avenue, Suite 700 3006636

Tallahassee, FL 32301

FARMHOUSE TOMATOES INC

200 East Broward Blvd. Suite 1800 3026822

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

EAST COAST PACKERS LLC

1900 Old Dixie Highway 3015466

Fort Pierce, FL 34946

FTG DEVELOPMENT INC

13981 Mcgregor Boulevard Unit 202 3002360

Fort Myers, FL 33919

TRIANGLE CAPITAL INC

MIXON FRUIT FARMS INC

777 Sw 37Th Ave 3006691

Miami, FL 33135

ODONNELL LANDSCAPES INC

5301 N Habana Unit 3 Apt, Suite, Bldg. (Optional) 3008301

Tampa, FL 33614

STEEL DOG CONCEPTS LLC

5301 N Habana Unit 3 Apt, Suite, Bldg. (Optional) 3008299

Tampa, FL 33614

MORE CAKE LLC

66 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

THOMAS CRAPPS

300 S Duval Street Suite 410 2964577

Tallahassee, FL 32301

TIMOTHY J MEENAN

300 S Duval Street Suite 410 2964578

Tallahassee, FL 32301

JEFFREY AARON BACKMAN

200 East Broward Blvd. Suite 1800 3001123

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

GREGORY P NELSON

1900 Old Dixie Highway 3015467

Ft. Pierce, FL 34946

Other Attorneys

GEORGE T LEVESQUE

301 South Bronough Street Suite 600 2884088

Tallahassee, FL 32301

PAULA A SAVCHENKO

100 W Cypress Creek Rd Suite 930 3062303

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309

COLLEEN M ERNST

The Capitol Pl-5 400 S Monroe Street 3025933

Tallahassee, FL 32399

LOUISE WILHITE-ST LAURENT

4052 Bald Cypress Way Bin C-65 2614030

Tallahassee, FL 32399

GERALD J DONNINI

100 West Cypress Creek Rd Suite 930 3088607

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309

MICHAEL JOVANE WILLIAMS

4052 Bald Cypress Way Bin A 02 2877175

Tallahassee, FL 32399

SEANN FRAZIER

215 South Monroe Street Suite 750 3000646

Tallahassee, FL 32301

DEVIN VELVEL FREEDMAN

100 Se 2Nd Street Suite 2800 3017704

Miami, FL 33131

JOSEPH MICHAEL MAIDA

418 The Captiol 402 South Monroe Street 3063735

Tallahassee, FL 32399-1100

GUSTAVO SARDINA

1110 Brickell Ave Ste 506 3000644

Miami, FL 33131

JONATHAN S ROBBINS

350 East Las Olas Boulevard Suite 1600 2940407

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

JOHN MACIVER

The Capitol Pl-05 2955599

Tallahassee, FL 32399

KARL E PEARSON

485 N Keller Rd Suite 401 2627044

Maitland, FL 32751

KRISTEN BOND

215 South Monroe Street Suite 750 3022171

Tallahassee, FL 32301

MICHAEL R BEATO

119 South Monroe Street, Suite 300 3069039

Tallahassee, FL 32301

SEAN X COLON

101 S Old Coachman Rd Apt 113 3003176

Clearwater, FL 33765

52 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2019
  • HearingEvent: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Start: 11:00 AM; Location: 2E; Judge: DODSON; Source: BM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • HearingEvent: MOTION HEARING; Start: 2:00 PM; Location: 301C; Judge: DODSON; Source: BM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • HearingEvent: MOTION HEARING; Start: 9:30 AM; Location: 301C; Judge: DODSON; Result: CANCELLED; Source: BM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • HearingEvent: MOTION HEARING; Start: 9:30 AM; Location: 301C; Judge: DODSON; Source: BM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • HearingEvent: MOTION HEARING; Start: 10:45 AM; Location: 3C; Judge: DODSON; Source: BM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • HearingEvent: MOTION HEARING; Start: 10:15 AM; Location: 301C; Judge: DODSON; Source: BM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • HearingEvent: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Start: 10:00 AM; Location: 301C; Judge: DODSON; Source: BM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • HearingEvent: MOTION HEARING; Start: 9:30 AM; Location: 365K; Judge: DODSON; Source: BM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • HearingEvent: MOTION HEARING; Start: 10:30 AM; Location: 365K; Judge: DODSON; Source: BM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • HearingEvent: MOTION HEARING; Start: 8:00 AM; Location: 365K; Judge: DODSON; Source: BM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • HearingEvent: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Start: 2:00 PM; Location: 365K; Judge: DODSON; Source: BM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Start: 11:15 AM; Location: 365K; Judge: DODSON; Source: BM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Start: 9:15 AM; Location: 3C; Judge: DODSON; Source: BM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • HearingEvent: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Start: 9:30 AM; Location: 365K; Judge: DODSON; Source: BM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Start: 9:30 AM; Location: 3C; Judge: DODSON; Source: BM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • HearingEvent: MOTION HEARING; Start: 1:30 PM; Location: 3C; Judge: DODSON; Source: BM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • HearingEvent: MOTION HEARING; Start: 2:00 PM; Location: 301C; Judge: LEWIS; Result: CANCELLED; Source: BM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • DispositionAction Description: OTHER CONSTITUTIONAL CHALLENGE STATUTE OR ORDINANCE; Open/Reopen Status: OPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 12/13/2017; Judge: DODSON

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRIANGLE CAPITAL PROPERTIES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sardina, Gustavo

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GEORGE T LEVESQUE