Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 10/05/2020 at 16:53:37 (UTC).

FINLEY, SURBRINEO vs BENITO JR, SEGUNDINO P

Case Summary

On 07/31/2020 FINLEY, SURBRINEO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BENITO JR, SEGUNDINO P. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHARLES DODSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1407

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Leon County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHARLES DODSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FINLEY, SURBRINEO

Tallahassee, FL 32309

Defendant

BENITO JR, SEGUNDINO P

North Carolina, FL 28278

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

MICHAEL C PECKHAM

7111 Fairway Drive Suite 105 2813653

Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33418

CINDY P MASSION

305 S Gadsden St1327727

Tallahassee, FL 32301

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT SEGUNDINO PE BENITO JRS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

9/23/2020: DEFENDANT SEGUNDINO PE BENITO JRS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

DEFENDANT SEGUNDINO PE BENITO JRS NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST INTERROGATORIES

9/23/2020: DEFENDANT SEGUNDINO PE BENITO JRS NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

9/3/2020: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

9/3/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

9/3/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

9/3/2020: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

9/3/2020: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #1521927

7/31/2020: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #1521927

SUMMONS ISSUED

7/31/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

7/31/2020: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

7/31/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

7/31/2020: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

COMPLAINT

7/31/2020: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

7/31/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT SEGUNDINO PE BENITO JRS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT SEGUNDINO PE BENITO JRS NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DispositionAction Description: AUTO NEGLIGENCE; Open/Reopen Status: OPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 7/31/2020; Judge: DODSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #1521927

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketJUDGE DODSON, CHARLES W: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peckham, Michael C.