Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 10/05/2020 at 06:11:24 (UTC).

FIELDER TREE SERVICES LLC vs JONES, DOUGLAS

Case Summary

On 07/23/2020 FIELDER TREE SERVICES LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JONES, DOUGLAS. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JASON JONES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1348

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Leon County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JASON JONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIELDER TREE SERVICES LLC

8511 Bull Headley Rd Ste 400 3106110

Tallahassee, FL 32312-5132

Defendant

JONES, DOUGLAS

Tallahassee, FL 32303-2844

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ELWIN R THRASHER

908 North Gadsden St2487616

Tallahassee, FL 32303

 

Court Documents

MEDIATION REPORT

9/29/2020: MEDIATION REPORT

MEDIATION REPORT

9/29/2020: MEDIATION REPORT

COURT MINUTES

9/29/2020: COURT MINUTES

LETTER/EMAIL - CONTACT INFO FOR HEARING

9/17/2020: LETTER/EMAIL - CONTACT INFO FOR HEARING

ORDER TO PROVIDE TELEPHONE NUMBER FOR PRE-TRIAL MEDIATION CONFERENCE

9/14/2020: ORDER TO PROVIDE TELEPHONE NUMBER FOR PRE-TRIAL MEDIATION CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF HEARING

8/27/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING

MEDIATION REPORT

8/25/2020: MEDIATION REPORT

ORDER TO PROVIDE TELEPHONE NUMBER FOR AUGUST 25, 2020 PRE-TRIAL MEDIATION CONFERENCE

8/12/2020: ORDER TO PROVIDE TELEPHONE NUMBER FOR AUGUST 25, 2020 PRE-TRIAL MEDIATION CONFERENCE

RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED

7/29/2020: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #1520842

7/23/2020: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #1520842

SUMMONS ISSUED

7/23/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM/COMPLAINT

7/23/2020: STATEMENT OF CLAIM/COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

7/23/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2020
  • HearingEvent: PRETRIAL SC; Start: 9:30 AM; Location: CA1; Judge: JONES; Source: BM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEDIATION REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEDIATION REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT MINUTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/EMAIL - CONTACT INFO FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO PROVIDE TELEPHONE NUMBER FOR PRE-TRIAL MEDIATION CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketEMAIL SENT TO THRASHER, ELWIN R III RE SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2020 SC 001348, FIELDER TREE SERVICES LLC VS. JONES, DOUGLAS WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS: NOH-8/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketPRETRIAL SC SET FOR 09/29/2020 AT 9:30 AM IN CA1, JDG: JONES, JASON LEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • HearingEvent: PRETRIAL SC; Start: 9:30 AM; Location: CA1; Judge: JONES; Source: BM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEDIATION REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO PROVIDE TELEPHONE NUMBER FOR AUGUST 25, 2020 PRE-TRIAL MEDIATION CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DispositionAction Description: SMALL CLAIMS MORE THAN $2500.00 BUT NOT MORE THAN $5000; Open/Reopen Status: OPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 7/23/2020 3:39:34 PM; Judge: JONES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #1520842

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketJUDGE JONES, JASON LEE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketPRETRIAL SC SET FOR 08/25/2020 AT 9:30 AM IN CA1, JDG: JONES, JASON LEE

    Read MoreRead Less