This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 09/24/2021 at 13:01:03 (UTC).

ENVISION CREDIT UNION vs SMITH, RONNIE

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 ENVISION CREDIT UNION filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SMITH, RONNIE. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MONIQUE RICHARDSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2058

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MONIQUE RICHARDSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ENVISION CREDIT UNION

C/O J. Blair Boyd, Esquire P.O. Box 3637 3177795

Tallahassee, FL 32315-3637

Defendants

SMITH, RONNIE

Gretna, FL 32332

SMITH, SHANICIE R

Gretna, FL 32332

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHN BLAIR BOYD

Post Office Box 36372878313

Tallahassee, FL 32315

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT $320.00 RECEIPT #1593710

9/23/2021: PAYMENT $320.00 RECEIPT #1593710

SUMMONS ISSUED

9/17/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

9/17/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM/COMPLAINT

9/17/2021: STATEMENT OF CLAIM/COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

9/17/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

9/17/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2021
  • HearingEvent: PRETRIAL SC; Start: 9:30 AM; Location: CA1; Judge: RICHARDSON; Source: BM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $320.00 RECEIPT #1593710

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketJUDGE RICHARDSON, MONIQUE R: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketPRETRIAL SC SET FOR 11/02/2021 AT 9:30 AM IN CA1, JDG: RICHARDSON, MONIQUE R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DispositionAction Description: SMALL CLAIMS MORE THAN $5,000 BUT NOT MORE THAN $8000; Open/Reopen Status: OPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 9/17/2021 11:05:32 AM; Judge: RICHARDSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ENVISION CREDIT UNION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Boyd, John Blair